Jewell v. United States

Plaintiff: Wayne J. Jewell
Defendant: Johann Rothwangl, United States and Joseph Rivet
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00324
Filed: August 15, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 14 Defendant's proposed Discovery Plan; terminating 15 plaintiff's proposed Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Ready for Trial on 1/23/2013. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/26/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/14/2012. Discovery deadline 9/26/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 8/16/2012.(jab)
June 19, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
January 16, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Show Cause ORDER re 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) Modified on 1/17/2013 to add text, "Show Cause". (jab).
February 22, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
August 22, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jewell v. United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne J. Jewell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johann Rothwangl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Rivet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]