Chambers v. Eppolitto

Plaintiff: Randolph Chambers
Defendant: John Eppolitto
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
 
Case Number: 1:2011fp00355
Filed: August 2, 2011
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 22 Report and Recommendations; approving 28 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
December 15, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal as to Randolph Chambers, initial fee of $21.75. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Fee due 1/17/2012.(mm)
August 3, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial filing fee assessed is $33.40. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 8/29/2011. (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chambers v. Eppolitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Chambers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eppolitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]