Hanson v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Defendant: FNU Hazelton, FNU Horne, FNU Consentino, John Blomeke, FNU Trainor, Niki LNU, Spencer Mead, Prime Care Medical, Inc., Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, Judy LNU and Jane Doe
Plaintiff: Michael Hanson
Case Number: 1:2011fp00534
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Filing Fee is assessed in the amount of $39.33. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 1/2/2012.(amm)
December 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 7 Order to Transport and continuing the December 13,2011 hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
January 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Reconsideration. ; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Clarify ; granting 15 Motion to Clarify ; taking under advisement 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Complaint to be served on Hazelton. Complaint to be amended as ordered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
January 17, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
January 31, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 22 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 19 Report and Recommendations/Order Directing Service,. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Follow up on Objection on 2/13/2012.(mm)
February 2, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Extend Time to Object to 19 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
February 14, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 19 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mxm)
February 17, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
April 2, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for permission to file interlocutory appeal. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
September 4, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Clerk's Office is directed to prepare a summons for defendant Lennon and forward to U.S. Marshal's office, together with copies of the documents indicated in the order, to effect service upon defendant Lennon. Defendant Lennon is to answer within 21 days of service; Defendant Haseltine is to answer to the allegations/claims set forth in motion to amend and supplement the complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. ( Answer Follow Up on 9/25/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
September 18, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 48 Report and Recommendations; denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
October 1, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the time for the plaintiff to file an objection or response to the 50 Report and Recommendations to October 12, 2012. (Follow up on Objections to R&R on 10/12/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(jab)
October 16, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 50 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Amend and supplement the complaint. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
January 9, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 70 Report and Recommendation, granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hazelton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Horne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Consentino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Blomeke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Trainor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niki LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Mead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care Medical, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]