LeBlanc v. NH State Prison, Warden et al

Defendant: Paul Casio, Anthony Ramirez, Kevin Stevenson, NH State Prison, Warden, Janis Phelps, Emily Bryant and Teresa Quint
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Daniel J. LeBlanc, Sr.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00084
Filed: March 2, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service as to NHSP Employees and US Marshal as to Non-NHSP Employees as outlined. Defendants to answer within 21 days of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
September 17, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 8 Report and Recommendations; approving 11 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
November 27, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 28 Discovery Plan; denying without prejudice 27 Discovery Plan and denying without prejudice 25 Motion to Compel. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/8/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/15/201 3. Discovery deadline 7/12/2013. ( Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/8/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/15/2013. Discovery deadline 7/12/2013. Further, the court grants oral request and instructs the clerks office to terminate Phelps as a named defendant from the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)
March 6, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial filing fee is assessed in the amount of $0. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. IFP Consent Form due 3/30/2012.(lml)
June 21, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PRO SE PLAINTIFF to Amend his Complaint. Failure to amend the complaint as directed, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, will result in this courts recommendation that the complaint be dismissed re: 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya McCafferty.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LeBlanc v. NH State Prison, Warden et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Casio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Ramirez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stevenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Phelps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Quint
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. LeBlanc, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]