Riley v. Colantuono et al

Defendant: John P. Kacavas, Thomas Colantuono and Seth R. Aframe
Plaintiff: Daniel John Riley
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00175
Filed: May 7, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Referring Judge: David L. Martin
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(ko)
June 21, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER mooting 13 Ex Parte Motion for civil summons. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(ko)
July 26, 2012 20 Featured Case ///MEMORANDUM AND ORDER approving 10 Report and Recommendations. Counts II, V, and VI of the original complaint are DISMISSED. Riley's motion to amend his complaint is GRANTED. Riley may proceed on Counts I, II, and III of his amended complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.(ko)
May 9, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Steven J. McAuliffe recused. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
October 24, 2012 34 Featured Case ERROR FILED IN WRONG CASE.ORDER: Without objection, Attorney Wiberg's motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Wiberg's oral motion and RESET the plaintiffs deadline nunc pro tunc to October 31, 2012, to allow for the receipt and docketing of his objection is GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge John H. Rich III.(ko) Modified on 10/26/2012 to add: ERROR FILED IN WRONG CASE.(ko).
March 5, 2013 37 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 36 Report and Recommendation: The defendants motion to dismiss the amended complaint is GRANTED. Riley's amended complaint is dismissed in its entirety and the clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.(ko)
May 10, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(lml)
May 10, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(lml)
May 11, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(lml)
May 15, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riley v. Colantuono et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Kacavas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Colantuono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth R. Aframe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel John Riley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]