Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.

Defendant - Stayed: Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00273
Filed: July 19, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 11 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Parties to file a Joint Motion to Supplement Discovery Plan on or before 11/5/12. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/17/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/10/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 10/26/2012. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/5/2012 for Supplement.(dae)
February 7, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lt)
July 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Strike. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lt)
July 30, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part as outlined 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - stayed: Stanley Convergent Security Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phenix Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Gardner Mattson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]