Gonzalez v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Cirino Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2012cv00375
Filed: October 3, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: George Z. Singal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming the 21 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Motion for Clarification (ECF No. 19) is DENIED. Defendants Relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE and the Petition is DISMISSED. Motion to Extend filed in 1:07-cr-00189-GZS-3 (ECF No. 693) is DISMISSED AS MOOT for reasons stated in footnote 1. So Ordered by Judge George Z. Singal.(ko)
October 11, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court CONCURRING ORDER 4 Designated Case Order Out. USDC-Maine Judge George Z. Singal is designated to preside over this case. Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk is assigned to perform such duties that may be assigned to her by the district judge to whom this case is assigned. So Ordered by Chief Judge John A. Woodcock, USDC-Maine.(jeb)
October 17, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. The court orders the United States Attorney to file an answer by December 18, 2012 or a motion to dismiss in lieu of a response shall be filed by November 19, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cirino Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]