Merrill v. USA

Petitioner: Jeffrey Merrill
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00397
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 6 Motion for Hearing; denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
October 23, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: US Attorney to Answer within 30 days of the date of this order. Answer Follow Up on 11/23/2012. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
November 7, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Attachments (pages from Presentence Investigation Report) to 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Motion for Hearing.Attachments to be sealed and only available electronically to case participants. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Merrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]