Villar v. United States Of America et al

Defendant: United States of America, Stephen R. Monier, Dr. Julia Buttermore and Kimberly Dow
Plaintiff: Richard Villar
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00424
Filed: November 5, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lml)
May 20, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
May 23, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(lml)
May 23, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty recused. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(lml)
July 31, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 35 the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan dated June 27, 2013. So Ordered by US District Judge William E Smith.(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Villar v. United States Of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Monier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Julia Buttermore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Dow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Villar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]