Mentus v. NH State Prison, Warden

Petitioner: Adam Mentus
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00447
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla) Modified on 5/29/2014 to add: certificate of appealability text(dae).
May 16, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service upon respondent Richard Gerry as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Defendant to answer within 30 days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
October 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to filing a properly supported motion for summary judgment re: 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mentus v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Mentus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]