Pruden v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al

Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc. and Harmon Law Offices, P.C.
Plaintiff: Juliet E. Pruden
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00452
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving with minor modifications the 28 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Ready for Trial on 4/15/2014. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/1/2013. Discovery deadline 10/31/2013.(jab)
March 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ; mooting 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
May 23, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting as to Counts I and III and granting in part as to Count II 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 52 Motion to Strike 51 Surreply to Reply. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pruden v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Represented By: Joshua William Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon Law Offices, P.C.
Represented By: Scott C. Owens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet E. Pruden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]