Holland v. Stoddard, Town Zoning Board of Adjustment et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Holland
Defendant: Dennis Pellegrino, Stoddard, Town Zoning Board of Adjustment, Stoddard, Town of and Harry R. Power
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00455
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Motion to Dismiss; 10 Motion to Dismiss; and 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 31, 2013 is continued. Parties to respond as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 7, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER RE: SUSPENSION OF ATTORNEY JASON A. CZEKALSKI. The Pending Motion Hearing scheduled for March 6, 2013 will be continued. Additionally, on or before April 8, 2013, the plaintiff shall file a pro se appearance or have new c ounsel file an appearance to represent him in this case. See LR 83.6. The Deputy Clerk shall reschedule the pending motion hearing for a date after May 15, 2013. The parties shall also file a revised discovery plan on or before May 15, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (Attachments: # 1 NH Supreme Court ORder LD-2013-0003)(cmp)
April 30, 2013 16 Featured Case ///ORDER: The plaintiff was ordered to file a pro se appearance or have new counsel file an appearance to represent him in this case on or before April 8, 2013. As neither a pro se appearance nor appearance by counsel has been filed, this case is dismissed without prejudice under LR 83.6(d). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(ko) Modified on 4/30/2013 to add:/// (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Holland v. Stoddard, Town Zoning Board of Adjustment et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Holland
Represented By: Jason A. Czekalski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Pellegrino
Represented By: Matthew R. Serge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoddard, Town Zoning Board of Adjustment
Represented By: Matthew R. Serge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoddard, Town of
Represented By: Homer S. Bradley, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry R. Power
Represented By: Homer S. Bradley, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]