Lintner et al v. Bank of New York, Mellon et al

Defendant: Bank of New York, Mellon and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Embree and James Lintner
Case Number: 1:2012cv00462
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 29, 2013 before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving (with changes) 15 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/15/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/1/2013. Close of Discovery deadline 10/15/2013. Joint Mediation Statement due by 8/15/2013.(cmp)
December 6, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 12/23/2013.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lintner et al v. Bank of New York, Mellon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York, Mellon
Represented By: Joshua D. Shakun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Represented By: John A. Houlihan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Embree
Represented By: David H. Bownes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lintner
Represented By: David H. Bownes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]