Hansen v. Sentry Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mark A. Hansen
Defendant: Sentry Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00466
Filed: November 30, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 21 Featured Case ///ORDER granting in part as to plaintiff's declaratory judgment claim in Count I under RSA 491:22 and otherwise denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 28, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting as outlined 27 Motion for Leave to supplement the record. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
April 17, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lt)
April 22, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
May 17, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER approving 39 Discovery Plan; parties to file motion to supplement by 6/7/13. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/7/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/31/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 8/1/2013. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/15/2014. (dae)
June 12, 2013 46 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hansen v. Sentry Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Hansen
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Represented By: Clark Proffitt
Represented By: Stephen B. Mosier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]