Graham v. US Social Security Administration

Defendant: US Social Security Administration
Notice Only: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Tod Graham
Case Number: 1:2012cv00496
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 1 SSA Complaint without prejudice for failure to comply with the July 12, 2013 Order. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
March 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
July 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff to file Motion for Order Reversing and serve Joint Statement of Material Facts or file Motion to Extend by 7/22/13 or case will be dismissed without prejudice. Motion to Reverse due by 7/22/2013. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. US Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.