Gosselin v. Kench, et al

Defendant: Eric Turner, Robert McGrath, Ronald Clark, Richard M. Gerry, William L. Wrenn, James Brown and Christopher Kench
Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: John J. Gosselin
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00514
Filed: December 26, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
June 26, 2013 11 Featured Case /// ORDER approving 9 Report and Recommendation; dismissing 1 Complaint (document nos. 1, 5 and 7). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
July 29, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER: plaintiff to file a motion for leave to file objection to Report and Recommendation on or before August 13, 2013. ( Motions due by 8/13/2013.) So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
January 2, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to John T. Gosselin, initial fee of $-0-. While 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1) requires the court assess an initial filing fee, given the plaintiff's current ba lance of $.02 there shall be no initial filing fee assessed. Going forward, however, the plaintiff shall be responsible for monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to his account, which shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 3/4/2013(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gosselin v. Kench, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McGrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Gerry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Wrenn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kench
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Gosselin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]