Barnett v. Lynch

Defendant: Daniel J. Lynch
Plaintiff: Cushaw Banacek Barnett
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00051
Filed: April 19, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: John A. Woodcock
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(jeb)
April 19, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jeb)
April 19, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jeb) Modified on 4/20/2012 to correct DATE FILED from 4/20/12 to 4/19/12. (jeb).
April 23, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jeb)
April 23, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jeb)
April 25, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CONCURRING ORDER re: 17 Designated Case Order Out. Chief Judge John A. Woodcock, Jr., US District Court-Maine, is designated and assigned to preside over this case. Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk is assigned to perform such duties under 28 U.S.C. § 636 (a)-(c) as may be assigned to her by the district judge to whom this case is assigned. So Ordered by Chief Judge John A. Woodcock. (jeb)
April 27, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Custodial Certificate filed by Cushaw Banacek Barnett. Plaintiff shall notify the Court no later than May 17, 2012 whether he intends to incur the cost of the $3 50.00 filing fee and proceed with this action or whether he intends to forego this litigation at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk. Plaintiff's notification to Court to proceed or forego this litigation due 5/17/2012.(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barnett v. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cushaw Banacek Barnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]