Polansky v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, et al

Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Helen Hanks, Jon Fouts, David Freedman, Bernice Campbell, Celia Englander and NH State Prison, Warden
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Christopher Polansky
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00105
Filed: April 3, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER referring 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the Magistrate Judge. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
March 19, 2013 110 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 77 Motion to Amend ; denying without prejudice 81 Motion for Permanent Injunction; approving 104 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mxm)
March 27, 2013 118 Featured Case ORDER referring 115 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
April 4, 2013 123 Featured Case ORDER granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; approving 114 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
October 2, 2013 166 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 Motion to Reopen Case; denying 128 Motion to Amend ; denying 129 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 130 Motion to Compel; denying 131 Motion to Amend ; denying 132 Motion to Proceed in f orma pauperis.; denying 133 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 134 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 135 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 136 Motion to Amend ; denying 146 Motion to inform; denying 153 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 154 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 155 Motion to Amend ; approving 161 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
May 30, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
May 31, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Christopher Polansky, initial fee of $-0-. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 7/30/2012(jeb)
June 15, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER approving 19 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
June 20, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER approving 24 Report and Recommendations; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
July 27, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Motion to add new documents and photos to the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
September 11, 2012 55 Featured Case ORDER approving 42 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/1/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/1/2012.(mm)
October 4, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; approving 50 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
November 21, 2012 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion for reprieve; approving 63 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
December 10, 2012 72 Featured Case ORDER referring 71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mxm)
January 17, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER referring 81 Motion for Injunction to the Magistrate Judge. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
April 3, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER re: 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: On or before April 24, 2012, plaintiff shall submit a Certificate of Custodial Institution signed by an authorized individual from the N.H. State Prison for the six-month period immediately preceding March 19, 2012. (Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 4/24/2012 for receipt of Certificate.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jeb)
February 4, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER denying 66 Motion for for access to the law library; denying 71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; approving 75 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Polansky v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Hanks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fouts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Freedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Englander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Polansky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]