Lisasuain v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections

Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Armando Lisasuain
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00224
Filed: July 2, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
December 11, 2012 14 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 10 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
January 30, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER approving 22 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/1/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/1/2013.(mm)
February 1, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER approving 21 Report and Recommendation; denying 13 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
May 8, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
May 22, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER document 41 construed as a motion to reconsider. Order on 37 reconsidered, clerk's office to supply copies as directed So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
June 11, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 31 Motion for Hearing ; approving 39 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
July 3, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Armando Lisasuain, initial fee of $-0-. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 9/4/2012(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lisasuain v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Lisasuain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]