Sweeney v. NH State Prison

Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Defendant: NH State Prison
Plaintiff: John J. Sweeney, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2012fp00276
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
December 18, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
December 19, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring plaintiff's complaint addenda (doc. nos. 9 and 11), which contain requests for preliminary injunctive relief. Magistrate Judge shall file her proposed findings and recommendations with the court, and a copy shall forthwith be mailed to all parties. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln) Modified on 12/19/2012 to correct grammatical error.
December 20, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Sullivan is to file a response to the request for preliminary injunctive relief within seven days of the date the office of the NH Attorney General accepts service on his behalf, or, if that office declines to accept service, the date Sullivan is served. (Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/22/2013 to check status of acceptance of service.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
January 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's excessive force claims against defendants Sullivan, Samson, and Logan; a retaliation claim against defendant Sullivan, and an ADA claim against the N.H. Stat e Prison will go forward; plaintiff withdrew his discrimination claim, and all other remaining claims and defendants are hereby dismissed from this action. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2013: # 1 added correct main document with signature) (jab).
January 31, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff to file a motion, within fourteen days of the date of this order, advising the court if he is presently in need of an injunction in order to avoid imminent irreparable harm. (Motions due by 2/14/2013.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
March 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 31 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/17/2013. Discovery deadline 11/1/2013. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 11/15/2013. Ready for Trial on 3/18/2014.(jab)
March 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 32 Report and Recommendation, denying plaintiff's motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief (document nos. 9, 11 and 27). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
December 2, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 45 Report and Recommendation; granting 38 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab) Modified on 12/3/2013 to correct filing date. (jab).
October 15, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to John J. Sweeney, Jr., initial fee of $-0-. Going forward, however, the plaintiff shall be responsible for monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to his account, which shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 12/14/2012(lml)
October 16, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the request for preliminary injunctive relief contained in the complaint to the Magistrate Judge 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
October 26, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1 Complaint, 7 Motion for Reconsideration. The motion to reconsider (doc. no. 7) is denied without prejudice to renewal. The request for a preliminary injunction in the complaint (doc. no. 1) is held in abeyance pending the expiration of the time for Sweeney to file an amended complaint. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2012.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney v. NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Sweeney, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]