Crosby v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, et al

Defendant: Jacob Braley, FNU Chapel, FNU Cormier, FNU Darko, FNU McGowen, FNU Nadeau, FNU Roy and Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Plaintiff: Christopher Crosby
Case Number: 1:2012fp00383
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service: Clerk's office is directed to complete summonses for the following defendants: SCDC; NHSP inmate Braley, SCDC Officers Lt. Roy, Sgt. McGowen, Cpl. Cormier and C.O.'s Baggs , Nadeau, Darko and Chapel and forward for service the summonses and copies of the complaint, addenda and exhibits thereto (doc. nos. 1, 7 and 8), the Report and Recommendation issued this date, and this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
August 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding in abeyance any ruling re: 23 Discovery Plan. Defendant Braley has until 8/22/2013 to file any objections or notify the court that he has no objections to the discovery plan. (Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2013.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
September 3, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER re 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counts I, II and IV are dismissed due to Crosby's failure to exhaust the administrative remedies available to him. Defendants' request for dismissal of Crosby's st ate-law claims is denied, and the case remains on track for trial of Counts VI, VII-A, VII-B, VIII, and IX. Crosby has seven days from the date of this order to show cause why (1) his claims against Sgt. McGowen should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and (2) Count VIII should not be dismissed. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
October 17, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit and Custodial Certificate filed by Christopher Crosby, initial fee of $-0-. Going forward, the plaintiff shall be responsible for monthly pay ments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to his account, which shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 12/17/2012(jeb)
February 4, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order re 1 Complaint. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2013.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chapel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Darko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McGowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Nadeau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Crosby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]