Barnett v. Levin

Plaintiff: Cushaw Barnett
Defendant: Jeff Levin
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00518
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: John J. McConnell
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mr. Barnett is ORDERED to file an amended complaint on or before March 25, 2013 that sets forth a cause of action and satisfies the Twombly/Iqbal pleading requirements. If an amended complaint is not filed this action will be dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Barnett's IFP Application is Denied as MOOT. So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.(ko)
February 5, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
February 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(lml)
February 6, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(lml)
February 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barnett v. Levin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cushaw Barnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Levin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]