Brown v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Elaine Brown
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00021
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: George Z. Singal
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER approving 11 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge George Z. Singal.(ko)
January 15, 2013 4 Featured Case CONCURRING ORDER re: 3 Referral Order-Designated Case Order Out to District of Maine. So Ordered by Chief Judge John A. Woodcock.(jeb)
January 17, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: Unless Elaine Brown files an amended petition by February 19, 2013, that contains sufficient grounds and factual allegations to show cause why the United States should be ordered to answer the petition, this petition shall be subject to summary dismissal following initial review pursuant to Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)
February 28, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. The court orders the United States Attorney to file an answer by April 30, 2013. In the event that the United States Attorney contends that the motion is not timely filed or that it is a second or successive motion, a motion to dismiss in lieu of a response shall be filed by March 28, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Margaret J. Kravchuk.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elaine Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]