Yelgin v. Raymond School District

Defendant: Raymond School District
Plaintiff: Louis Yelgin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00030
Filed: January 18, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL - case to be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
April 24, 2013 7 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 1, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 8, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER approving 6 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/3/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 9/3/2013.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yelgin v. Raymond School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Yelgin
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]