Hanus et al v. Loon Mountain Recreation Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Susan Hanus and Michael Hanus
Defendant: Boyne USA, Inc., Loon Mountain Recreation Corporation and Scott Patterson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00044
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 3, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 21 Discovery Plan as submitted/with changes. Length of Trial 7 days. Case Track: Complex. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/1/2013.(ko)
April 16, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court SEE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM ORDER (doc. no. 37) ///ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' claims against them is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' claims against Patterson remain pending, as do the counterclaims against the plaintiffs by LMRC and Boyne. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) Modified on 4/16/2014 to add: corrected order text (jb).
April 16, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ///CORRECTED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' claims against them is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' claims against Patterson remain pending, as do the counterclaims against the plaintiffs by LMRC and Boyne. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanus et al v. Loon Mountain Recreation Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hanus
Represented By: Mark D. Wiseman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hanus
Represented By: Mark D. Wiseman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyne USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B.S. Quarles, Jr.
Represented By: Margaret A. O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loon Mountain Recreation Corporation
Represented By: Margaret A. O'Brien
Represented By: Thomas B.S. Quarles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]