Cheney v. Harwood et al

Defendant: NH Supreme Court Attorney Discipline Board and Wade Harwood
Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Michael G. Cheney
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00067
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 9 Motion to Amend. Plaintiffs federal claims are dismissed for failure to state a plausible claim for relief. The court declines to exercise supplement jurisdiction as to any state law claims, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1367(c)(3), which are dismissed without prejudice. Clerk to enter judgment andclose the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
February 19, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit, Custodial Certificate, and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Michael G. Cheney, initial fee of $83.49. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.Finance Follow Up Deadline 4/22/2013(jeb)
July 18, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 Complaint. Within 14 days, plaintiff to file motion to amend the complaint as outlined or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Motion due by 8/1/2013. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cheney v. Harwood et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Supreme Court Attorney Discipline Board
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Harwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Cheney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]