The Mortgage Specialists, Inc. et al v. NH Banking Department, Commissioner

Defendant: NH Banking Department, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Michael J. Gill and The Mortgage Specialists, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00156
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Complaint. Hearing re 14 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief set for May 13, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. Parties to jointly file a sing le timeline and Statement of Agreed Facts as outlined by May 8, 2013, and proposed findings of fact and rulings of law by May 10, 2013. Plaintiff to file proposed order as outlined by May 10, 2013. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 10, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Recusal of Hon. Judge Joseph N. LaPlante. The motion lacks merit, and is denied. For other reasons, however, the court sua sponte recuses itself. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 25, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling 21 Motion to Dismiss, 35 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for a hearing. (Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.) So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
August 9, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: No amended complaint having been filed with the court, the clerk's office shall enter judgment in accordance with the oral order granting defendant's motion to dismiss and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
April 5, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Mortgage Specialists, Inc. et al v. NH Banking Department, Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Banking Department, Commissioner
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Gill
Represented By: Anthony S. Augeri
Represented By: Michael S. Parousis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mortgage Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Parousis
Represented By: Anthony S. Augeri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]