Banerjee v. Wilmot, NH, Town of

Defendant: Wilmot, NH, Town of
Plaintiff: Monica Banerjee
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00203
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
September 6, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
November 8, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPLACED BY DOCUMENT #31 ORDER denying 24 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna) Modified on 11/8/2013 to add: REPLACED BY DOCUMENT #31 (mm).
November 8, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER denying 24 Motion to Amend, declining to assert supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims and dismissing those claims without prejudice to Banerjees right to pursue her state law claims in state court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (Correcting the opinion number)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Banerjee v. Wilmot, NH, Town of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmot, NH, Town of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Banerjee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]