Kelly v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al

Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, Rebecca LNU, Tracy LNU, Dawn LNU and Strafford County Sheriff
Plaintiff: Howard Dennis Kelly
Case Number: 1:2013fp00107
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm) Modified on 6/4/2013 to correct party making service (mm).
June 27, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused - Corey Belobrow appeared for the defendants. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
June 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk's office to resend copies of the 9 Report and Recommendation and 10 ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Plaintiff must file an objection to the Report and Recommendation within fourteen days after service of the report and recommendation ( Follow up on Objections to R&R on 7/15/2013.) So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab) Modified on 6/28/2013 to correct title of doc. no. 10. (jab).
July 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 9 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment claims asserted against Superintendent Dowaliby and Sheriff Dubois are hereby dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
May 7, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint; denying 32 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 35 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Extend the Trial Day. Clerk's Office to redocket Amended Complaint and contact Attorney Belobrow re acceptance of service as outlined. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
June 10, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 40 Motion for Partial Reconsideration; denying without prejudice 43 Motion to Extend Defendants' E xpert Disclosure Deadline; denied in its entirety 29 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint; Original complaint 1 shall be deemed the operative complaint in this action. The clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case as outlined. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko) Modified on 6/11/2014 to add: docket text re doc. no. 29 and original complaint text (ko).
May 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Prisoner Consent Form filed by Howard Dennis Kelly. Given the plaintiffs current balance is $0.06 there shall be no initial filing fee assessed. Going forward, h owever, the plaintiff shall be responsible for monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to his account, which shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 7/5/2013(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Sheriff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Dennis Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]