Kerner v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner

Petitioner: Mark Kerner
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Respondent: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner and Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden
Case Number: 1:2013fp00132
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Lift Stay; granting 12 Motion to Amend 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying without prejudice 14 Motion for Independent In-Camera Review ; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for H earing ; denying without prejudice 19 Motion for to Subpoena Witnesses. The clerk's office is directed to redocket petitioner's proposed amended petition (doc. no. 12-1) as the amended petition in this matter. Petitioner has 30 days for the date of this order to file the appropriate documentation as described therein. (Notice of Compliance deadline 6/9/2014) So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
June 20, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Clerk's office is directed to amend the docket to reflect that Edward Reilly is the only respondent in this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jab)
March 27, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 43 Report and Recommendation; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss; denying 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and denying as moot 44 Motion for to Request that "Motion for Continuances" and "Affidavits" be Admitted, and to Expand the Record to Include Them. The court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)
July 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 1 Motion to Stay the statute of limitations. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner must file either a motion to stay his § 2254 petition or motion to amend his § 2254 petition. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerner v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Kerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Northern NH Correctional Facility, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.