Saunders v. Fortier

Defendant: Joanne Fortier
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Dianna Saunders
Case Number: 1:2014cv00016
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 5 Motion for Summary Judgment, recommending the district judge should grant respondent's motion for summary judgment (doc. no. 5), deny the petition for a writ of habeas corpus (doc. no. 1), and decline to issue a certificate of appealability. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/2/2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
February 12, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 5 Motion for Summary Judgment; approving 12 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
April 14, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Fortier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Fortier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Saunders
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Karp
Represented By: Robert L. Sheketoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.