DURKIN v. PACCAR, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JESSICA DURKIN
Defendant: PACCAR, INC., PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANY, WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION, SPANSET, INC., ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC, DURA-BOND INDUSTRIES, INC., DURA-BOND COATING, INC., DURA-BOND STEEL CORP., DURA-BOND PIPE, LLC and DURA-BOND DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Cross_claimant: ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC and SPANSET, INC.
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND COATING, INC., DURA-BOND STEEL CORP., DURA-BOND PIPE, LLC, DURA-BOND DEVELOPMENT, INC., PACCAR, INC., PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANY, WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION, SPANSET, INC., DURA-BOND INDUSTRIES, INC. and ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02013
Filed: April 22, 2010
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. Rodriguez
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Deft's 160 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/28/2013. (drw)
March 28, 2013 218 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/28/2013. (drw)
March 28, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will reserve its decision on 149 Motion for Summary Judgment and re-calendar the motion for 4/29/2013; ORDER denying Deft's 152 Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Pltf's Expert Brooks Rugemer; denying Deft's [1 54] Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Pltf's Expert William Vigilante; granting in part Deft's 174 Motion to Strike Pltf's Responses to the Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/28/2013. (drw)
May 29, 2013 221 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 5/29/2013. (drw)
May 29, 2013 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft Wabash National Corporation's 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 5/29/2013. (drw)
September 30, 2013 232 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/30/2013. (drw)
September 30, 2013 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Donio's 192 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/30/2013. (drw)
October 19, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/19/2010. (drw, )
October 19, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft PACCAR Defts' 6 Motion to dismiss all punitive damage claims; granting Dura-bond Defts' 8 Motion to dismiss all claims. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/19/2010. (drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DURKIN v. PACCAR, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA DURKIN
Represented By: STEWART J. EISENBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT M. COOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT M. COOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: GERHARD P. DIETRICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPANSET, INC.
Represented By: JAMES H. ROHLFING
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL KUNSCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURA-BOND INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURA-BOND COATING, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURA-BOND STEEL CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURA-BOND PIPE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURA-BOND DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL KUNSCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: SPANSET, INC.
Represented By: JAMES H. ROHLFING
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND COATING, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND STEEL CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND PIPE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT M. COOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PETERBILT MOTORS COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT M. COOK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: WABASH NATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: GERHARD P. DIETRICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SPANSET, INC.
Represented By: JAMES H. ROHLFING
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DURA-BOND INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL P. DORSEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ANCRA INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]