SPECTRUM PRODUCE DISTRIBUTING, INC. v. FRESH MARKETING, INC. et al

Plaintiff: SPECTRUM PRODUCE DISTRIBUTING, INC.
Defendant: FRESH MARKETING, INC., FRESH MARKETING FARMS, LLC, MARIA DONATO and RALPH DONATO
Case Number: 1:2011cv06368
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Jerome B. Simandle
Referring Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 21 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED without prejudice to re-filing as it is procedurally premature. ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter DEFAULT against Defts. Fresh Marketing, Inc., Fresh Marketing Farms, LLC, Ralph Donato and Maria Donato. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/14/2011. (dmr)
March 12, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/12/2012. (dmr)
March 12, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ORDERED that 25 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of Spectrum Produce Distributing, Inc. and against Fresh Marketing, Inc., Fresh Farms, LLC, Maria Donato, and Ralph Donato jointly and severally in the amount of $345,183.09, etc; ORDERED that Pltf's motion for default judgment as to Pltf's claim for attorney's fees and costs is denied without prejudice to Pltf filing the necessary materials to support judgment as to those amounts consistent with L. Civ. R. 54.1 and 54.2 within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/12/2012. (dmr)
June 20, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/20/2012. (dmr)
November 1, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 11/1/11. (th, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPECTRUM PRODUCE DISTRIBUTING, INC. v. FRESH MARKETING, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPECTRUM PRODUCE DISTRIBUTING, INC.
Represented By: MINOS H. GALANOS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESH MARKETING, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESH MARKETING FARMS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA DONATO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH DONATO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]