WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY v. INTERLINE BRANDS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: INTERLINE BRANDS, INC., MTD (USA) CORPORATION, WATTS WATER TECHNOLOGIES, WATTS PLUMBING TECHNOLOGIES (TAIZHOU) CO., LTD., WATTS REGULATOR CO., LINX, LTD, JOHN DOES (1-100) and EVERLOTUS INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2012cv06775
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Presiding Judge: Jerome B. Simandle
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FILED. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/1/13. (js)
December 20, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/19/2013. (dmr)
March 25, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FILED. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/25/13. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY v. INTERLINE BRANDS, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEFANIE G. EBERT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERLINE BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: RACHAEL KATHERINE SNYDER von RHINE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD (USA) CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS WATER TECHNOLOGIES
Represented By: RALPH R. SMITH, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS PLUMBING TECHNOLOGIES (TAIZHOU) CO., LTD.
Represented By: RALPH R. SMITH, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS REGULATOR CO.
Represented By: RALPH R. SMITH, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINX, LTD
Represented By: ADAM BRIAN KAPLAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-100)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERLOTUS INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]