PAULSBORO DERAILMENT CASES

Plaintiff: JUNE LORD, CYNTHIA LORD, KENNETH LORD, DAVID CRAWFORD, B.L., KENNETH LORD, JR., BRITTNEY SCOTT, KENNETH B. JOHNSON, JR., JOE CRAWFORD, GLORIA RONE, CAROL L. MILLER, CHRISTINA NELSON, THOMAS FRANKS, JR., HELEN KIDD, DENISE SCOTT, JANICE RAIVELY, THOMAS FRANKS, CHRISTOPHER CRAWFORD, TAMARA SCOTT, CHANTE SCOTT, E.M.L., BRITTANY CALCE, ALVERA BLANDING ROBINSON, JUAN SUREY, TASHAYA CRAWFORD, NICOLE WILLIAMS, AARON FLETCHER, DONALD WILSON, MISHON WILSON, YVETTE CRAWFORD, TRAVIS CUSTIS, ZENA R. CUSTIS, JAIMEEK O., ERICKA FIREOVED, REBECCA LOUNSBERRY, MARCUS GAINES, RICHARD SAUL, TANIA MARRIOTT, ZARIA MARRIOT, DONNA ROOTS, CHANTEL ROOTS, LONDYN GRAHAM, JORDAN THOMPSON, J.G., CARRIE LOUNSBERRY, ALICE BREEMAN, KEVIN B. LANGSTON, CHRISTINE FRANKS, CHRISTINA FRANKS, AMANDA LORD, J.L., JEFFREY RAIVELY, CECILIA FRANKS, PATRICIA JOHNSON, CIARA JOHNSON, KENNETH JOHNSON, III, HOWARD G. LOUNSBERRY, TRACY LEE, ANDREW J. FRANKS, JA'VONN O., TONYA KIDD, DEANDRE FOWLKES, TIFFANY CRAWFORD, OWEN HAYNES, TRACY SCOTT, KENNETH JOHNSON, JOHN STEPHENSON, JASON PERKINS, KATELYN SAUL, JORDAN NORMAN, DOMINIQUE MERCHANT, KE'VONNA JOHNSON, THERESA M. STONE, DON WILSON and JEREMY PERKINS
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., JOHN OR JANE DOES 1-100, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, JOHN OR JANE DOE and JAMES OR JOY DOE
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00784
Filed: February 8, 2013
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Gloucester
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 166 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2013. (drw)
October 4, 2013 168 Featured Case OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/13. (js)
October 4, 2013 170 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2013. (dmr)
October 4, 2013 173 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2013. (dmr)
October 4, 2013 177 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2013. (dmr)
October 7, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDER granting Defts' 101 Motion to Dismiss. Count I of the Complaint, and Pltfs' requests for attorney's fees are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Count V and Pltfs' requests for medical monitoring are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pltfs may request leave to amend their complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2013. (drw)
October 9, 2013 184 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/9/13. (dd, )
November 4, 2013 229 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defts 158 Motion to Dismiss. Count VI is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. The motion is DENIED as to Count IV. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/4/2013. (drw)
December 31, 2013 305 Featured Case OPINION re entry #58 Motion to Remand in case 13-cv-208 Kidd et al v. Consolidated Rail Corporation et al. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/30/2013. (dmr)
January 13, 2014 315 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/13/2014. (drw)
January 13, 2014 316 Featured Case ORDER remanding Case No. 13-5583 to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Gloucester County. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/13/2014. (drw)
March 24, 2014 390 Featured Case ORDER denying Pltfs 325 Motion to Remand. Pltfs shall file a SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/24/2014. (drw)
April 8, 2014 400 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/8/14. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PAULSBORO DERAILMENT CASES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE LORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA LORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH LORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.L.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH LORD, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTNEY SCOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH B. JOHNSON, JR.
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA RONE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL L. MILLER
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA NELSON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS FRANKS, JR.
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN KIDD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE SCOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE RAIVELY
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS FRANKS
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMARA SCOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANTE SCOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.L.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY CALCE
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVERA BLANDING ROBINSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN SUREY
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHAYA CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE WILLIAMS
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON FLETCHER
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD WILSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISHON WILSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVETTE CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS CUSTIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZENA R. CUSTIS
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIMEEK O.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICKA FIREOVED
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA LOUNSBERRY
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS GAINES
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SAUL
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANIA MARRIOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZARIA MARRIOT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA ROOTS
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANTEL ROOTS
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONDYN GRAHAM
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN THOMPSON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.G.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE LOUNSBERRY
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE BREEMAN
Represented By: ALAN HERSCHEL SKLARSKY
Represented By: MITCHELL A. KAYE
Represented By: LAWRENCE A. KATZ
Represented By: ESTHER EVA BEREZOFSKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN B. LANGSTON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE FRANKS
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA FRANKS
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA LORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY RAIVELY
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA FRANKS
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA JOHNSON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIARA JOHNSON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON, III
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD G. LOUNSBERRY
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY LEE
Represented By: JAMES J. PETTIT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW J. FRANKS
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JA'VONN O.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA KIDD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANDRE FOWLKES
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY CRAWFORD
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN HAYNES
Represented By: JAMES C. SHAH
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY SCOTT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN STEPHENSON
Represented By: JAMES J. PETTIT
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON PERKINS
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATELYN SAUL
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN NORMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE MERCHANT
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KE'VONNA JOHNSON
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA M. STONE
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON WILSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY PERKINS
Represented By: SHAWN M. LATOURETTE
Represented By: STUART J. LIEBERMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Represented By: BRETT JUSTIN LEAN
Represented By: JESSICA ELIZABETH GENSLER LIPPY
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: BRETT JUSTIN LEAN
Represented By: JESSICA ELIZABETH GENSLER LIPPY
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN OR JANE DOES 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: BRETT JUSTIN LEAN
Represented By: JESSICA ELIZABETH GENSLER LIPPY
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN OR JANE DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES OR JOY DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]