HAROLD C. " HAL" TURNER v. 4CHAN.ORG et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Harold C. Turner d/b/a Turner Radio Network d/b/a Hal Turner Radio Show alleged that Defendants 4chan.org, 7chan.org, ebaumsworld.com, nexisonline.com and abjects.com posted unauthorized copies of his radio shows online, attacked Plaintiff\'s server so as to make it unavailable, and placed unauthorized orders for goods, services and merchandise from third parties in Plaintiff\'s name.

Defendant: 7CHAN.ORG, JOHN DOE(S) 1-1000, 4CHAN.ORG, EBAUMSWORLD.COM, NEXISONLINE.NET and ABJECTS.COM
Plaintiff: HAROLD C. " HAL" TURNER
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv00306
Filed: January 19, 2007
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Presiding Judge: Peter G. Sheridan
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against 4CHAN.ORG, 7CHAN.ORG, EBAUMSWORLD.COM, NEXISONLINE.NET, ABJECTS.COM ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 343307.) JURY DEMAND, filed by HAROLD C. " HAL" TURNER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )
January 19, 2007 2
DECLARATION of HAROLD C. "HAL" TURNER re in support of OTSC, Appl. for TRO & Motion for Preliminary Inj. (DD, )
January 22, 2007 3 Featured Case
ORDER that the appl. for temporary restraints is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/22/07. (DD, )
January 19, 2007 4
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan : Show Cause Hearing held on 1/19/2007. (Court Reporter IRA RUBENSTEIN.) (dh, )
February 15, 2007 5
ANSWER to Complaint w/attached exh's [placed in chmbrs] by 7CHAN.ORG [Ian Schoonover].(DD, )
April 6, 2007 6 Featured Case
ORDER Pursuant to Rule 16.1 directing that the Court will issue a scheduling Order based on the information the litigants are to submit no later than May 28, 2007.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/6/07. (jq, )
May 1, 2007 7
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to HAROLD C. TURNER (DD, )
November 15, 2007 8
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41.1(a)Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2007 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (Please be advised that the motion will be decided on the papers unless otherwise notified by the court).(dh, )
December 17, 2007 9 Featured Case
ORDER DISMISSING CASE (dh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HAROLD C. " HAL" TURNER v. 4CHAN.ORG et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7CHAN.ORG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-1000
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4CHAN.ORG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBAUMSWORLD.COM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEXISONLINE.NET
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABJECTS.COM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD C. " HAL" TURNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]