MENA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: FRANCISCO MENA
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2013cv01508
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 8/8/2013. (nr, )
March 11, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REOPENING CASE; denying motion to Appeal Court's Decision, ECF No. 16; denying as moot motion to Supplement Evidence, ECF No. 17; closing case. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/11/2014. (nr, )
June 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/3/2013. (nr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCISCO MENA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ROBERT L. FRAZER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]