T.M. v. Viacom, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: VIACOM INC. and GOOGLE INC
Plaintiff: T. M.
Case Number: 2:2013cv03756
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 13 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (jl, )
June 19, 2013 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (jl, )
June 18, 2013 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:12-cv-01295. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to District of New Jersey in re: MDL No. 2443 Nickelodeon Consumer Privacy Litigation. (cjo)
May 8, 2013 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Parties to submit report of status of related MDL action on or before 9/6/2013. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/8/2013. (dka, )
April 25, 2013 9 Joint MOTION to Stay CASE PENDING OUTCOME OF MDL MOTION by T. M.. (Rosenfeld, Thomas)
April 24, 2013 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Roberts on behalf of Google, Inc. (Roberts, John)
April 24, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gail Lees on behalf of Viacom, Inc. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2013 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyGail Lees $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1952616 by on behalf of Viacom, Inc.. (Lees, Gail)
February 27, 2013 5 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. and Viacom, Inc.. (cjo)
December 21, 2012 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Paul Green on behalf of T. M. (Green, Kevin)
December 21, 2012 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Goldenberg on behalf of T. M. (Goldenberg, Mark)
December 21, 2012 2 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Viacom, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1855404.), filed by T. M.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Thomas)
December 21, 2012 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 12-1295-JPG/DGW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.M. v. Viacom, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM INC.
Represented By: Gail Lees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC
Represented By: John C. Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. M.
Represented By: Thomas P. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kevin P. Green
Represented By: MARK C. GOLDENBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]