GRACO INC. et al v. PMC GLOBAL, INC. et al

Plaintiff: GRACO INC. and GRACO MINNESOTA INC.
Defendant: PMC GLOBAL, INC., PMC EUROPE INVESTMENTS, S.L., PMC, INC., DENIS S. COMMETTE, GAMA MACHINERY USA, INC. and GARRAF MAQUINARIA S.A.
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv01304
Filed: March 14, 2008
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Ocean
Referring Judge: John J. Hughes
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 570 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to compel the production of documents or, in the alternative, for an in camera review [dkt. entry no. 465] is GRANTED insofar as the Court will conduct an in camera review of the documents hig hlighted by Graco in the Cert. of Wallace-Jackson, Exhs. J-O and the documents PMC clawed back under cover of letters dated March 1, 2010 and June 30, 2010; that PMC shall provide the Court with the materials set forth above by 3/4/2011; that PMC sha ll provide the Court with an alphabetical list identifying all of the senders, recipients, and parties copied on the above materials, including their names, positions, employers, and whether they were/are attorneys by 3/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/14/2011. (mmh)
February 14, 2011 572 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 474 Motion to Compel regarding Graco's privilege logs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/14/2011. (mmh)
March 10, 2011 581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 483 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/10/2011. (mmh)
March 24, 2011 586 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants' Motion to compel further responses to written discovery [dkt. entry no. 486 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that Plaintiffs shall provide Defendants with the materials set forth by 4/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/24/2011. (mmh)
February 15, 2012 696 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER that Graco's Motion for Summary Judgment dated June 10, 2011 (Docket Entry 616 ) is granted in part and denied in part; that Mr. Commette's counterclaims (Counts One through Six) are dismissed; that Gama's counter claims (Count Five and Count Six) are dismissed; that Gama's counterclaim alleging a Sherman Act violation is limited to a Section 2 violation of high pressure spray foam equipment in North America. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/15/2012. (mmh)
March 6, 2012 699 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED Memorandum and Order. Redaction of d.e. 696 . Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 2/15/2012. (mmh)
March 31, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/31/2009. (mmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GRACO INC. et al v. PMC GLOBAL, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACO INC.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACO MINNESOTA INC.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC GLOBAL, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC EUROPE INVESTMENTS, S.L.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENIS S. COMMETTE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAMA MACHINERY USA, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRAF MAQUINARIA S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]