NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS UNITED RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE v. BOYNTON & BOYNTON, INC. et al

Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS UNITED RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE
Defendant: BOYNTON & BOYNTON, INC., KEVIN BYRNE and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2012cv05610
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Referring Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/28/2014. (jjc)
September 2, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/2/2014. (jjc)
December 16, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/16/2014. (jjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS UNITED RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE v. BOYNTON & BOYNTON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS UNITED RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE
Represented By: JEFFREY M. POLLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOYNTON & BOYNTON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN BYRNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.