ECHEVERRIA v. CORVASCE et al

Plaintiff: LUIS TORRAS ECHEVERRIA
Defendant: MAURO CORVASCE and EUGENE TACHER
Case Number: 3:2013cv01852
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Referring Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Freda L. Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/13/2013. (jjc)
May 8, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/7/2014. (kas)
May 20, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/20/2014. (kas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECHEVERRIA v. CORVASCE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS TORRAS ECHEVERRIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURO CORVASCE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE TACHER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]