Curtis & Associates, P.C. et al v. The Law Offices of David M. Bushman, Esq. et al

Plaintiff: Curtis & Associates, P.C. and W. Robert Curtis, Sc.D., J.D.
Defendant: The Law Offices of David M. Bushman, Esq., David M. Bushman, David M. Bushman, Esq., Janet Callaghan, Eileen Degregorio, Stevi Brooks Nichols, Jeffrey Levitt, Esq., Jeffrey Levitt, Herbert Monte Levy, Esq., Law Offices of Herbert Monte Levy, Esq., John Doe, Esq., Law Offices of John Doe, Esq., Jane Doe, Esq. and Law Offices of Jane Doe, Esq.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00890
Filed: March 3, 2009
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Ramon E. Reyes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order: (1) All defendants' motions to dismiss the federal RICO causes of action are granted and such claims are dismissed in their entirety and with prejudice. The co urt declines to exercise its supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' state law claims which are dismissed without prejudice. (2) Plaintiffs' motion to amend or supplement the complaint is denied as futile. (3) Plaintiffs' separate motions to disqualify Levitt and Levy as counsel are both denied as moot. (4) The motion for sanctions by the Levitt defendants and defendant Turansky is denied, and the court further declines to sua sponte issue sanctions. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to enter judgment in favor of defendants, to mail a copy of this memorandum and order to pro se defendant Nichols, and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/15/2010. (Ginns, Laura)
March 9, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 194 , 195 , 196 , 197 , 199 , and 200 , Motions for Bond. For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, defendants' motions to require plaintiffs' posting of an appeal bond are granted in part . Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than March 25, 2011, together, plaintiffs post an appeal bond with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $5,000 to cover the taxable costs of appeal. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this memorandum and order to pro se defendant Nichols. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/9/2011. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/9/2011. (Ginns, Laura)
May 20, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration. C/M by Chambers. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/20/2009. (Bodah, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis & Associates, P.C. et al v. The Law Offices of David M. Bushman, Esq. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: W. Robert Curtis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Robert Curtis, Sc.D., J.D.
Represented By: W. Robert Curtis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Offices of David M. Bushman, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Bushman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Bushman, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Callaghan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Degregorio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevi Brooks Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Levitt, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Levitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Monte Levy, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Herbert Monte Levy, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of John Doe, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Jane Doe, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]