Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Matthew John Ryan and Prime Rate and Return, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00513
Filed: May 3, 2010
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Rensselaer
Presiding Judge: Norman A. Mordue
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting the 90 Motion to Intervene and modifying the Court's 11 Order as stated. Signed by Judge Norman A. Mordue on 10/5/2012. (amt) [Deft served via reg. mail]
June 7, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, IMPOSING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 6/7/10. (mnm)
August 26, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF RECEIVER PAUL A. LEVINE, ESQ. FOR AUTHORITY TO PAY CURRENT AND FUTURE COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSE EXPENSES TO SUNRISE MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING -- the Application 15 is GRANTED and the Receiver isauthorized to compensate Sunrise for the period May 18 to May 31, 2010 in the amount of $2,813.20 and reimburse expenses in the amount of $151.20, with future compensation and reimbursements being permitted in accordance with the parties agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 8/26/10. (mnm)
October 8, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 33 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Stay. Paul A. Levine, Esq., the Court-appointedReceiver, may continue to obtain document discovery from third parties. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 10/8/10. (jlr)
October 20, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 17 Letter Motion from Paul A. Levine to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 10/20/10. (ban) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2010: # 1 Memorandum-Decision and Order) (tab, ).
May 3, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Order to Show Cause, The 5 Motion for TRO and Order Freezing assets and granting other relief. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/13/2010 at 11:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2010. Reply due by 5/12/10 by 2:00 p.m. Service of these papers shall be served on defendants on or before 5/5/10. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 5/3/10. (jlr/am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Ryan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Preethi Krishnamurthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew John Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Rate and Return, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]