Vaughan Company v. Global Bio-Fuels Technology, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vaughan Company
Defendant: Global Bio-Fuels Technology, LLC and Richard Behnke
Case Number: 1:2012cv01292
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Rensselaer
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER that defts' 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; and defts shall file their answer to the complaint on or before November 29, 2012. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/15/2012. (see)
October 23, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendants' 39 Cross-Motion for judgment on the pleadings; and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 51 Mot ion for leave to file a second amended answer and counterclaims. Counterclaims 1,4,5,6,9,10 and 12 are DISMISSED. Defenses 4,8,10, and 11 are STRICKEN. Defendants shall file the second amended answer and counterclaims on or before 10/30/2013. Upon the filing of the second amended answer and counterclaims, the caption shall be amended and a summons issued for service upon the additional counterclaim-defendants. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/23/2013. (amt)
July 11, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER that GBFT's requests for Vaughan to immediately supplement its patent imfringement claim contentions and amend its responses to interrogatories and, to the extent that GBFT seeks permission to file a motion for Rule 11 sanctions are denied. Vaughan's initial claim contention chart shall stand and that GBFT shall serve its limited disclosure of non-infringement, invalidity, and unenforceability contentions consistent with this Order. Parties shall file a proposed revised Scheduling Order by 7/18/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 7/11/14. (sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughan Company v. Global Bio-Fuels Technology, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughan Company
Represented By: John D. Cook
Represented By: William C. Alciati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Bio-Fuels Technology, LLC
Represented By: James R. Muldoon
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Behnke
Represented By: James R. Muldoon
Represented By: Ted H. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]