Gaul et al v. Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC et al

Defendant: DCFS Trust, TD Auto Finance LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Daimler Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Trans-Union LLC, Equifax Inc. and Deily, Mooney & Glastetter LLP
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Gaul and Paula Gaul
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00433
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. McAvoy
Referring Judge: Randolph F. Treece
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s 131 Motion to Dismiss. Deft Experian Information Solution, Inc. is hereby dismissed from the case w/ prejudice; Signed by Sr. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy dtd 10/28/2014 (cml)
July 23, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER re 24 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the motion in part as to Defendants Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, DCFS Trust and TD Auto Finance LLC and stays the instant pr oceedings as to these Defendants and further directs Plaintiffs to submit to arbitration as to these Defendants in accordance with the terms of the lease agreement. This matter may otherwise proceed as against any remaining defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/23/2013. (dpk)
April 15, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER denying Deft Equifax, Inc.'s 56 Motion to Dismiss and enforce settlement. Pltf's 60 motion for sanctions and to enforce settlement, as stated in their brief in opposition to Deft's motion, is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 4/14/14. [Served by mail.] (sfp, )
April 16, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Pltfs' 59 Omnibus Motion: (a) Pltfs' motion to join CBC Company is denied; (b) Pltfs' motion to compel Equifax to respond to requests for admissions is granted in pa rt. To the extent that Equifax has not responded to the request for admission, it must do so by 4/22/14; (c) Pltfs' motion for instruction on how to defend against a motion for summary judgment is denied; (d) Pltfs' motion to compel DMG to respond to their demands is denied; and (e) Pltfs' request access to electronic filing is granted. DMG's motion to compel is granted to the extent that Pltfs must supplement their responses to interrogatories and produce any further docume ntation they may have, consistent with this Memorandum-Decision and Order, by 5/16/14. Further, Paula Gaul must independently sign all responses so that there are no questions that the responses reflect her position as well as Jeffrey Gaul. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 4/16/14. [Served by mail.] (sfp, )
May 1, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER regarding discovery issues: Equifax has until 5/9/14 to respond to Pltfs' request for admissions, if not, then Gaul may file a motion to compel. Gaul must respond to Interrogatories and Demand for production by 5/9/14, if not, Experian may file a motion to compel. Gaul was directed to provide responses and documents to DMG's Demands by 5/16/14, if not, DMG may file a motion to compel. If the Gauls fail to appear for their depositions on 6/4/14 and 6/5/14, the defts may filed motions to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Randolph F. Treece on 5/1/14. [Served by mail.](sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gaul et al v. Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCFS Trust
Represented By: Richard C. Maider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Maider
Represented By: Richard C. Maider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lee M. Pollack
Represented By: Joshua A. Weiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Maider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Maider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-Union LLC
Represented By: William M. Huse
Represented By: Robert J. Schuckit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Conroy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deily, Mooney & Glastetter LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Gaul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Gaul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]