OptiGen, LLC v. Texas A&M University System et al

Plaintiff: OptiGen, LLC
Defendant: Texas A&M University System, DNA Diagnostics, Inc., Melba S. Ketchum, International Genetics, Inc., Genetic Fulfillment USA, LLC, Pinpoint DNA Technologies, Inc. and Richard B. Dobbins
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv00457
Filed: April 17, 2009
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Tompkins
Referring Judge: Gustave J. DiBianco
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2009 30 Featured Case ORDER granting the # 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is Ordered that Case 5:09-cv-457 and 5:09-cv-6 are consolidated for all purposes and will remain assigned to District Judge Suddaby and Magistrate Judge DiBianco with Case 5:09-cv-6 designated as the LEAD CASE. Further Ordered that all future papers are to be docketed in Lead Case 5:09-cv-6. No further docketing shall be done in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gustave J. DiBianco on 6/18/2009. (mae)
February 8, 2010 35 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT: in favor of OptiGen, LLC against Texas A&M University System, and Dr. Ernest Gus Cothran. Texas A&M and its employees, including but not limited to Dr. Ernest Gus Cothran shall be permanently enjoined from all activity that constitu tes practicing the inventions contained in the following patents: U.S. Patent No. 5,804,388, U.S. Patent No. 6,201,114, U.S. Patent No. 6,210,897, U.S. Patent No. 6,428,958, U.S. Patent No. 7,312,037, Texas A&M shall be permanently enjoined from all activity that constitutes practicing the inventions for commercial purposes of the invention contained in U.S. Patent No. 7,285,388. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of this Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/6/2010. (jmb)
November 14, 2012 36 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Optigen, LLC against Defendants International Genetics, Inc., Genetic Fulfillment USA, LLC, PinPoint DNA Technologies, Inc. and Richard B. Dobbins permanently enjoining the defendants from all activity, including making, using, offering to sell and/or selling, any product or service in the countries or territories where OptiGen has patented protection for the inventions involving the patents listed herein. (lmw )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: OptiGen, LLC v. Texas A&M University System et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OptiGen, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Lane, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas A&M University System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNA Diagnostics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melba S. Ketchum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Genetics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genetic Fulfillment USA, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinpoint DNA Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Dobbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]