Car-Freshner Corporation et al v. Getty Images, Inc.

Plaintiff: Car-Freshner Corporation and Julius Samann Ltd.
Defendant: Getty Images, Inc.
 
Case Number: 7:2009cv01252
Filed: November 9, 2009
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Watertown Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: George H. Lowe
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 43 Featured Case MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendants' # 14 motion to dismiss plaintiffs' # 28 Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56; and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part plaintiffs' # 16 cross-motion for discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. This proceeding shall return to Magistrate Judge Lowe for the supervision of the discovery process. Signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/27/2011. (mae)
June 27, 2012 70 Featured Case JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT: this action is DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice to the right of the parties to secure reinstatement of the case within thirty (30) days after the date of this judgment by making a showing that the settlement was not, in fact, consummated; and in the event that no request is made for reinstatement within thirty (30) days of the date of this judgment, the dismissal of this case shall thereafter be with prejudice. (lmw)
June 28, 2012 71 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Car-Freshner Corporation and Julius Samann Ltd. against Getty Images (US), Inc., Getty Images, Inc. (lmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Car-Freshner Corporation et al v. Getty Images, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Car-Freshner Corporation
Represented By: Nancy L. Pontius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Samann Ltd.
Represented By: Nancy L. Pontius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Images, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]