Unites States v. Pokerstars, et al Featured Case

Online poker companies PokerStars, Full Tilt Poker, and Absolute Poker were charged with money laundering and forfeiture. A civil case brought by the Justice Department accused the company of bank fraud, wire fraud, money laundering, and illegal gambling in operations that brought in some $3 billion from online gamblers. In court agreements (below) between the three (3) online poker companies and the U.S. Justice Department, an independent monitor will be appointed to monitor and verify that nobody is playing online poker in the U.S. for "real money." All money paid by U.S. players to PokerStars, Full Tilt Poker, and Absolute Poker will be refunded to them, and each poker web site will have specific instructions and procedures for players on how to the get their money back for U.S. transactions.

Defendant: PYR Softward Ltd, Stelekram Ltd., Sphene International Ltd., Tiltware LLC, Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Pocket Kings Ltd., Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Filco Ltd., Vantage Ltd., Ranston Ltd., Mail Media Ltd., Full Tilt Poker Ltd., SGS Systems Inc, Trust Services Ltd., Pokerstars, Full Tilt Poker, Absolute Poker, Ultimate BET, Oldford Group LTD, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Enterprises LTD, Blue Water Services Ltd, Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Fiducia Exchange Ltd and Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua
Plaintiff: United States Of America
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02564
Filed: April 14, 2011
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Leonard B. Sand
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 Mailed 4 certified copies of 309 Order, to Assistant United States Sharon Cohen Levin, Chief of Asset Forfeiture, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. (sdi)
September 30, 2013 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: 309 Final Order of Forfeiture, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (tn)
September 30, 2013 309 Featured Case FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE: Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 853(n)(7), the United States of America shall and is hereby deemed to have clear title to the Defendant Currency (the "Forfeited Property"), and the same is hereby forfeited to the United States for disposition according to law; the United States Marshals Service shall take possession of the Forfeited Property and dispose of the same according to law, in accordance with 21 U.S.C. § 853(h); the Court retains jurisdiction over the interpretation and enforcement of this Final Order of Forfeiture; the Clerk of the Court shall forward four certified copies of this Final Order of Forfeiture to Assistant United States Sharon Cohen Levin, Chief of Asset Forfeiture, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/30/2013) (tn)
September 24, 2013 308 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on July 19, 2013 through August 17, 2013. Document filed by United States Of America. (Levin, Sharon)
July 26, 2013 307 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO ROBB EVANS: 1. The FDIC shall immediately transfer funds from the Sunfirst Accounts as follows: (1). $6,812,227.82 to a seized asset account operated by the United States Marshal Service, and (2)$6,812,227.82 to the Claimant Robb Evans. 2. Wells Fargo shall immediately transfer to a seized asset account operated by the U.S. Marshals all funds in its possession that are, or were, held on deposit in the Wells Fargo Triple Seven Account or the Wells Fargo Kombi Capital Account. 3. The Government is hereby authorized to seize and take possession of the funds held in the Cyprus Triple Seven Account and the Cyprus Golden Shores Account. 4. Upon receipt of such funds set forth in paragraphs 2 and 3, the Government shall transfer to the Claimant fifty percent of the total assets obtained from the Wells Fargo Triple Seven Account, the Cyprus Triple Seven Account, and the Wells Fargo Kombi Capital Account (together with the funds transferred by the FDIC to the Claimant pursuant to Paragraph 1, the "Claimant Funds"). And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/25/2013) (ama)
July 16, 2013 306 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT WITH RESPECT TO ABSOLUTE POKER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, and Jason H. Cowley, of counsel, and the Absolute Poker Group, by its counsel, Jerry D. Bernstein, Esq., of Blank Rome LLP, that: 1. The Absolute Poker Group agrees that all assets, including property of all kinds, real and personal, tangible and intangible, goodwill, right or non-physical resource that is presumed to represent an advantage in the marketplace, and anything having commercial or exchange value, of the following Absolute Poker-affiliated and controlled companies (collectively, the the Absolute Poker Group"), or any other transferee of assets f/b/o the Absolute Poker Group, its owners or designees shall be forfeited to the United States, for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981: As set forth herein. Blanca Games hereby withdraws its claim in this action for the assets of Blue Water Services Ltd., Trust Services Ltd., SGS Systems Inc. and Fiducia Exchange Ltd. The civil money laundering claims against the Named Absolute Poker Companies are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with the exception of the civil money laundering claims against Blue Water Services Ltd., Trust Services Ltd., SGS Systems Inc. and Fiducia Exchange Ltd., which remain pending. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/15/2013) (ama)
June 17, 2013 305 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO THE COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, EX REL., J. MICHAEL BROWN, SECRETARY JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY CABINET: The Commonwealth hereby fully and finally dismisses its claim in this action to the Full Tilt Domain Substitute Assets. Upon the entry of this Stipulated Order of Settlement, the Full Tilt Domain Substitute Assets shall be forfeited to the United States for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981. In satisfaction's of the Commonwealth's claim to the Absolute Domains, the United States shall transfer $6 million to the Commonwealth (the "Settlement Funds"). The Commonwealth agrees that within 5 days of the entry of this Stipulated Order of Settlement, it shall dismiss its claims in the Kentucky Action to the Absolute Domains. The Government shall transfer the Settlement Funds to the Commonwealth within 10 days of the Commonwealth's dismissal in the Kentucky Action of its claims regarding the Absolute Domains. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/17/2013) (ft)
June 11, 2013 304 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER OF FORFEITURE OF $58 MILLION IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY: Mark Scheinberg agrees to forfeit to the United States the sum of $50 million (the "Forfeited Funds"), as full and final resolution of any and all claims by the United States as set forth in paragraph 7. Said funds shall be forfeited as a full and final settlement in lieu of the PokerStars Distributions that the Government alleges are subject to forfeiture. The Forfeited Funds shall be transferred to the United States Marshals Service within seven (7) business days of the signing of this Consent Order of Forfeiture, and upon transfer shall be maintained by the Marshals Service pending further order of the Court. Mark Scheinberg represents that he is the sole owner of the Forfeited Funds. Mark Scheinberg agrees that he shall not file any claims or petitions for remission relative to the Forfeited Funds, nor shall he assist others in filing any such claims or petitions. This Consent Order of forfeiture shall in no way be deemed an admission of any wrongdoing, culpability, liability, or guilt on behalf of Mark Scheinberg or any of his respective agents or employees, past and present. This Consent Order of Forfeiture is separate from the PokerStars Settlement and the Forfeited Funds shall not be credited toward the PokerStars Settlement. This Order may be executed in counterparts, each of which, when taken together, shall be deemed the complete Consent Order of Forfeiture. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/10/2013) (ft)
June 3, 2013 303 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL IN REGARD TO THE CLAIM OF AVOINE - SERVICO DE CONSULTADORIA E MARKETING, LDA: The claim of Avoine is hereby dismissed with prejudice, without leave to file any new or additional claims in this action in regard to the Defendant Property. Avoine is hereby barred from asserting any claim against the United States or any of its agents and employees (including, without limitation, the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI") and the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York ("USAO-SDNY")) in connection with or arising out of the United States' seizure, restraint, and/or constructive possession of the Defendant Property, including, without limitation, any claim that the united States did not have probable cause to seize and/or forfeit the Defendant Property, that the Claimant is a prevailing party or that the Claimant is entitled to attorneys' fees or any award of interest. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/3/2013) (ft) Modified on 6/3/2013 (ft).
April 17, 2013 302 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jason H. Cowley dated 4/4/2013 re: The Government respectfully requests that its pending motion to strike the claim of Robb Evans (D.E. 199) be withdrawn, with such withdrawal being without prejudice to the Government's ability to file a motion to strike on different grounds if the Government so chooses. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/17/2013) (ft)
February 22, 2013 301 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO CHRISTOPHER FERGUSON: Ferguson agrees to forfeit to the United States all funds in the Ferguson Account (the "Ferguson Account Funds") for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, without admitting any liability thereunder. Ferguson agrees to take all necessary steps to facilitate the immediate transfer of the Ferguson Account Funds to the U.S. Marshal Service. Ferguson further agrees to forfeit the additional amount of $2,350,000 ("the Additional Funds") for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, without admitting any liability thereunder. Ferguson shall make payment of the Additional Funds within 30 days of the entry of this Stipulated Order of Settlement. Ferguson hereby withdraw his claim and agrees that he shall not file any claim or petition for restoration or remission relative to the Ferguson Account Funds, the Additional Funds, or the Full Tilt Funds; or take any action or make any motion seeking to collaterally attack the seizure, restraint, or forfeiture of the Ferguson Account Funds, the Additional Funds, or his interest in the Full Tilt Funds. Furthermore, the parties hereby waive all rights to appeal or to otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement. This Stipulation and Order of Settlement fully and finally resolves this action as to the Ferguson Account Funds and Ferguson. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/21/2013) (ft) Modified on 2/22/2013 (ft). Modified on 2/22/2013 (ft).
January 29, 2013 300 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jason H. Cowley dated 1/28/2013 re: The Government requests, with the consent of claimant/defendant Ferguson, an additional three weeks to respond to claimant/defendant Ferguson's motions to dismiss, with an amended response date of February 19, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Responses due by 2/19/2013) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/29/2013) (ft) Modified on 1/31/2013 (ft).
January 14, 2013 299 DECLARATION of AUSA Jason H. Cowley in Support re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cowley, Jason)
January 14, 2013 298 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
January 4, 2013 297 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
January 2, 2013 296 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood, from Jason H. Cowley, dated 12/21/2012, re: request that the Court So Order that Cardroom shall have until January 4, 2013, to file a ten-page sur-reply brief in opposition to the motion to strike addressing its argument that the filing of the Second Amendment Complaint moots this motion, and that the Government shall have until January 14, 2013 to file a ten-page responsive brief. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. ( Responses due by 1/4/2013, Replies due by 1/14/2013.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/2/2013) (ja)
December 18, 2012 295 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO HOWARD LEDERER:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, Jason H. Cowley and Andrew D. Goldstein, of counsel, and Lederer, by his counsel, Elliot Peters, Esq., that: Upon the United States' taking possession of the entirety of the Forfeited Property, which the United States shall note through a filing on the docket, the in rem forfeiture action against the remaining Defendant Property and the civil money laundering claims against Lederer shall be dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, this Stipulation and Order of Settlement fully and finally resolves this action as to the Defendant Property and Lederer. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/17/2012) (ama)
December 18, 2012 294 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO ULTRA SAFE PAY, LLC:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, and Jason H. Cowley, of counsel, and the Claimant, by its counsel, Jeremy Frey, Esq., that: The Claimant, without admitting any liability, agrees that the Defendant Property shall be forfeited to the United States ("the Forfeited Funds"), for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981. Upon the entry of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement and the forfeiture of the Defendant Property, this action will be fully and finally concluded in regard to the Defendant Property. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/17/2012) (ama)
December 18, 2012 293 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO MAS, INC.: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, and Jason H. Cowley, of counsel, and the Claimant, by its counsel, Jeremy Frey, Esq., that: 1.The Claimant, without admitting any liability, agrees that the Defendant Property shall be forfeited to the United States ("the Forfeited Funds"), for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981. 2.Without admitting any wrong doing or liability, the Claimant and Manuel Sanchez ("Sanchez"), an authorized representative of Claimant, each further agrees not to provide, either directly or indirectly, payment processing services for internet gambling in the United States, including internet poker, until if and when a change in applicable law takes place making such gambling lawful in the United States and Claimant and/or its internet gambling customer obtains appropriate authorization from all relevant governmental regulatory authorities. 5.The Claimant hereby withdraws its claim to the Defendant Property, withdraws all pending motions in this action, and agrees that it shall not file any claim or petition for restoration or remission relative to the Defendant Property, or any action or motion seeking to collaterally attack the seizure, restraint, or forfeiture of the Defendant Property. Furthermore, the parties hereby waive all rights to appeal or to otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/17/2012) (ama)
December 18, 2012 292 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jason H. Cowley dated 12/14/2012 re: Accordingly, the Government and defendant/claimant Ferguson jointly request that (a) Ferguson's memorandum in support of Lederer's motion to dismiss (D.E. 286) be treated as a separate motion to dismiss on behalf of Ferguson; and (b) the Government will have until January 28, 2013 to respond to the motion, and Ferguson will have until February 18, 2013 to file any reply. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 1/28/2013, Replies due by 2/18/2013.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/17/2012) (ama)
December 12, 2012 291 Featured Case ORDER granting 277 Motion for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Kimba M. Wood)(Text Only Order) (Wood, Kimba)
December 10, 2012 290 Featured Case ORDER: On November 29, 2012, the above-captioned case was transferred to the HonorableKimba M. Wood. The parties are directed to file a status letter with the Court by December 17, 2012. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/10/2012) (cd)
November 29, 2012 289 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kimba M. Wood. Judge Leonard B. Sand is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
November 28, 2012 288 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT IN REGARD TO RAFAEL FURST AND TELAMONIAN AJAX TRUST: The Claimants agree to forfeit to the United States all funds in the Trust Account (the "Trust Account Funds") for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, without admitting any liability thereunder. The Claimants hereby withdraw their claims and agree that they shall not file any claim or petition for restoration or remission relative to the Trust Account Funds or the Additional Funds, or any action or motion seeking to collaterally attack the seizure, restraint, or forfeiture of the Trust Account Funds or the Additional Funds. This Stipulation and Order of Settlement fully and finally resolves this action as to the Defendant Property and the Claimants. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/27/2012) (ft) Modified on 11/28/2012 (ft). Modified on 12/6/2012 (ft).
November 20, 2012 287 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Jason H. Cowley dated 11/9/2012 re: The Government writes on its own behalf and on behalf of claimant Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex rel., J. Michael Brown, Secretary Justice and Public Safety Cabinet ("Kentucky") regarding the answer and counter claim that Kentucky filed on October 19, 2012. Kentucky, with the consent of the Government, requests that Kentucky's counter-claim, filed October 19, 2012, be dismissed without prejudice, and that such dismissal be without prejudice in particular to any rights or remedies available to Kentucky under 28 U.S.C § 2465(b). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/20/2012) (lmb)
November 16, 2012 286 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 281 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT AND CLAIMANT HOWARD LEDERER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S IN PERSONAM CIVIL MONEY LAUNDERING CLAIM AND FIRST AND SECOND IN REM CLAIMS.. Document filed by Christopher Ferguson. (Withers, Julie)
November 15, 2012 285 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ultra Safe Pay, LLC.(Michaels, Adam)
November 15, 2012 284 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by MAS, Inc..(Michaels, Adam)
November 15, 2012 283 CLAIM FOR ADMIRALTY. Document filed by Howard Lederer. (Peters, Elliot)
November 15, 2012 282 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 281 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT AND CLAIMANT HOWARD LEDERER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S IN PERSONAM CIVIL MONEY LAUNDERING CLAIM AND FIRST AND SECOND IN REM CLAIMS.. Document filed by Howard Lederer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peters, Elliot)
November 15, 2012 281 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT AND CLAIMANT HOWARD LEDERER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT'S IN PERSONAM CIVIL MONEY LAUNDERING CLAIM AND FIRST AND SECOND IN REM CLAIMS. Document filed by Howard Lederer.(Peters, Elliot)
October 19, 2012 280 RESPONSE re: 272 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Avoine's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Rodes, Leonard)
October 19, 2012 279 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 10/19/2012 re: Claimants Mas, Inc and Ultra Safe Pay request that their deadline to answer to the Second Amended Complaint be set for 11/16/2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. MAS, Inc. answer due 11/16/2012; Ultra Safe Pay, LLC answer due 11/16/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/19/2012) (cd)
October 19, 2012 278 ANSWER to 272 Amended Complaint,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against United States Of America. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet.(Lycan, David)
October 17, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 277 MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 17, 2012 277 MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hantman Decl. w Cert of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit Decl. of Sanai, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hantman, Robert)
October 17, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. 274 MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7904385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing.Missing Proposed Order. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days.Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a Proposed Order. The attorney seeking pro hac vice may re-file the motion using their own ECF log-in and password. (pgu)
October 15, 2012 276 DECLARATION of Cyrus Sanai in Support re: 274 MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7904385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
October 15, 2012 275 DECLARATION of Robert J. Hantman in Support re: 274 MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7904385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
October 15, 2012 274 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Cyrus Mark Sanai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7904385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC.(Hantman, Robert) Modified on 10/17/2012 (pgu).
October 2, 2012 273 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 10/1/2012 re: Counsel writes to propose the following briefing schedule: Lederer, Furst/Ajax Trust, and Ferguson shall have until November 16, 2012, to file motions to dismiss. The Government shall have until December 21, 2012, to file a response. Lederer, Furst/Ajax Trust, and Ferguson shall have until January 11, 2013, to file replies. All parties (with the exception of Lederer, Furst/Ajax Trust, and Ferguson who will be filing renewed motions to dismiss as noted below) shall have until October 19, 2012, to answer the Complaint. The motions schedule regarding Lederer, Furst/Ajax Trust, and Ferguson set forth above be adopted. All other deadlines in this action, including discovery deadlines, be terminated until the resolution of the motions to dismiss and the other motions set forth in this Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Absolute Entertainment, S.A. answer due 10/19/2012; Absolute Poker answer due 10/19/2012; Autoscribe Corporation answer due 10/19/2012; Raymond Bitar answer due 10/19/2012; Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua answer due 10/19/2012; Blue Water Services Ltd answer due 10/19/2012; Fiducia Exchange Ltd answer due 10/19/2012; Filco Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Full Tilt Poker answer due 10/19/2012; Full Tilt Poker Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Kolyma Corporation A.V.V. answer due 10/19/2012; Mail Media Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Oldford Group LTD answer due 10/19/2012; Oldford Group Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; PYR Softward Ltd answer due 10/19/2012; PYR Software Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Pocket Kings Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Pokerstars answer due 10/19/2012; Ranson Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Ranston Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD. answer due 10/19/2012; SGS Systems Inc answer due 10/19/2012; Sphene International Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Stelekram Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Tiltware L.L.C. answer due 10/19/2012; Tiltware LLC answer due 10/19/2012; Trust Services Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Ultimate BET answer due 10/19/2012; Vantage Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012; Vantage Ltd. answer due 10/19/2012.( Motions due by 11/16/2012., Responses due by 12/21/2012, Replies due by 1/11/2013.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/2/2012) (ft)
September 21, 2012 271 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Jason H. Cowle dated 9/21/2012 re: The Government respectfully writes in regard to its reply memorandum of law in further support of its motion for (l) the entry of the proposed stipulated order of settlement and (2) for an interlocutory sale of all assets of the Absolute Poker Settlement Group. The Government respectfully requests that it be permitted to file a reply brief of 15 pages in length. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/21/2012) (pl)
September 21, 2012 270 DECLARATION of AUSA Jason H. Cowley in Support re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cowley, Jason)
September 21, 2012 269 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
September 14, 2012 268 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin, MIchael D. Lockard and Jason H. Cowley dated 9/14/2012 re: The Government respectfully writes to request a brief adjournment of the Government's deadline to file a reply brief in further support of its motion for, inter alia, the interlocutory sale of all assets of several Absolute Poker-affiliated entities (D.E. 237), the Government respectfully requests that it have until September 21, 2012 to file its reply. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 9/21/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/14/2012) (djc)
September 13, 2012 267 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 5/8/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 13, 2012 266 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 5/8/2012 before Judge Leonard B. Sand. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 12, 2012 265 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 9/5/2012 re: Request to file a reply memorandum of law in further support of its motion to strike of 15 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/12/2012) (cd)
September 11, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Jason Harris Cowley to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. 264 Second Amended Complaint. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
September 10, 2012 264 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Cowley, Jason) Modified on 9/11/2012 (ka).
September 7, 2012 263 NOTICE of Withdrawal of the Claim in Forfeiture Proceeding Pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(5) for Admiralty or Maritime and Asset Forfeiture Actions. Document filed by Steve Segal. (Burt, Thomas)
September 7, 2012 262 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) United States Of America. Document filed by Steve Segal. (Burt, Thomas) Modified on 9/7/2012 (ka).
September 5, 2012 261 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 197 MOTION to Strike Document No. 150 (Claim of Avoine).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Lockard, Michael)
September 5, 2012 260 DECLARATION of Jason H. Cowley in Support re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Lockard, Michael)
September 5, 2012 259 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Lockard, Michael)
September 4, 2012 258 DECLARATION of Leonard A Rodes in Opposition re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Rodes, Leonard)
September 4, 2012 257 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Rodes, Leonard)
August 27, 2012 256 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 8/27/20 re: Counsel for the Government respectfully requests that the briefing schedule for the motion for, inter alia, the interlocutory sale of all assets of several Absolute Poker-affiliated entities (D.E. 237), be amended as follows: Avoine shall have until September 4, 2012 to respond to this motion. The Government shall have until September 14, 2012 to file a reply relating to this motion. The Government also respectfully requests that it have until September 4, 2012 to file its reply brief in regard to its motion to strike the claim of Avoine in this action. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., ( Responses due by 9/4/2012, Replies due by 9/14/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/27/2012) (pl)
August 21, 2012 255 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Surreply to Reply Memorandum on 8/21/2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Graham, Christopher)
August 21, 2012 254 NOTICE of SURREPLY TO REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE GOVERNMENTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE CLAIM OF ROBB EVANS OF ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES LLC, RECEIVER re: 249 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Graham, Christopher)
August 20, 2012 253 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
August 20, 2012 252 DECLARATION of Cyrus Sanai in Opposition re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
August 15, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 8/21/2012. (djc)
August 15, 2012 251 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Gary Owen Caris dated 8/15/2012 re: This letter is to request the Court's approval for Claimant Robb Evans of Robb Evans & Associates LLC, in his capacity as Receiver ("Receiver") appointed pursuant to the Preliminary Injunction Order ("Preliminary Injunction") issued in the case of Federal Trade Commission v. Jeremy Johnson, etc., et al., United States District Court, District of Nevada, Case No.2: 10-cv-02203-RLH-GWF ("FTC Action"), to file a short Surreply to the Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Government's Motion to Strike the Claim of Robb Evans of Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Receiver (Doc. No. 249) (the "Government's Reply") not to exceed five pages in length and to be filed by not later than August 21, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/15/2012) (djc)
August 14, 2012 250 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 8/14/2012 re: The Government respectfully writes to request leave to have filed a reply brief of 11 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/14/2012) (lmb)
August 13, 2012 249 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 199 MOTION to Strike Document No. 68 (Claim of Robb Evans).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cowley, Jason)
August 13, 2012 248 AFFIRMATION of Leonard A. Rodes in Opposition re: 197 MOTION to Strike Document No. 150 (Claim of Avoine).. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Rodes, Leonard)
August 13, 2012 247 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 197 MOTION to Strike Document No. 150 (Claim of Avoine).. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Rodes, Leonard)
August 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/20/2012; Replies due by 9/3/2012. (djc)
August 13, 2012 246 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Robert J. Hantman dated 8/8/2012 re: Specifically, Cardroom requests, without opposition from the Government, the following amendments to the current scheduling deadlines in regard to Cardroom and the Government: 1. Cardroom shall have until August 20, 2012 to file an opposition to the Government's motion to strike their claim. 2. The Government shall have until September 3, 2012 to file any reply relating to this motion. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/9/2012) (djc)
August 9, 2012 245 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 8/01/2012 re: Upon the request of counsel for Avoine-Servicio De Consultadoria E Marketing, LDA ("A voine"), who has requested additional time to respond to the Government's motion for, inter alia, the interlocutory sale of all assets of several Absolute Poker-affiliated entities (D.E. 237), the Government respectfully requests that the following briefing schedule be set regarding that motion. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 8/24/2012, Replies due by 9/7/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/06/2012) (ama)
August 9, 2012 244 NOTICE of First PokerStars Settlement Payment. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
August 6, 2012 243 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D Lockard, and Jason H Cowley dated 7/30/2012 re: Request for the following briefing schedule re government's motion to strike. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Responses due by 8/13/2012, Replies due by 8/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/6/2012) (cd)
August 3, 2012 242 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand, from Sharon Cohen Levin, dated 8/3/2012, re: request that the deadline for the Government to file an amended complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure be moved to September 10, 2012 from its present date of August 6, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/3/2012) (ja)
July 31, 2012 241 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT REGARDING POKERSTARS. Regarding the Forfeiture and Settlement of Claims With Respect to PokerStars and the Transfer of the Forfeited Full Tilt Assets, and as further set forth in said Stipulation and Order. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/31/2012) (rjm)
July 31, 2012 240 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT REGARDING FULL TILT POKER. Regarding the Forfeiture of Property and Settlement of Claims with Respect to Full Tilt Poker, as further specified in this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/31/2012) (rjm)
July 31, 2012 239 DECLARATION of AUSA Jason H. Cowley in Support re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cowley, Jason)
July 31, 2012 238 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowley, Jason)
July 31, 2012 237 MOTION For (1) the Entry of a Proposed Stipulated Order of Settlement Between the United States and Certain Absolute Poker-Affiliated Entities and (2) the Interlocutory Sale of All Assets of Those Entities. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 30, 2012 236 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Claim of Robb Evans of Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Receiver and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris on 7/30/2012. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Graham, Christopher)
July 30, 2012 235 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris in Opposition re: 199 MOTION to Strike Document No. 68 (Claim of Robb Evans).. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary Owen Caris, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary Owen Caris, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Gary Owen Caris)(Graham, Christopher)
July 30, 2012 234 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 199 MOTION to Strike Document No. 68 (Claim of Robb Evans). / Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Claim of Robb Evans of Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Receiver. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Graham, Christopher)
July 27, 2012 233 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Jason H. Cowley dated 7/26/2012 re: Counsel requests an adjournment of the following upcoming deadline: Avoine and Cardroom shall have until August 13, 2012 to file oppositions to the Government's motions to strike their respective claims. The Government shall have until August 27, 2012 to file any replies relating to these motions. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to ( Responses due by 8/13/2012, Replies due by 8/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/24/2012) (jfe)
July 27, 2012 232 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Jason H. Cowley dated 7/26/2012 re: The parties jointly requests that the Government's motion to strike the claim of Kentucky [D.E. 223] and Kentucky's motion to stay the proceedings in regard to certain defendant property (D.E. 220) be withdrawn without prejudice to the Parties' ability to renew such motions at a later date. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/27/2012) (jfe)
July 27, 2012 231 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohehn Levin dated 7/26/2012 re: The Government requests, with the consent of counsel for PokerStars, Lederer, Furst, and Ferguson, that the Court terminate the present response and reply deadlines for all motions to dismiss pending (1) PokerStars' answering the outstanding special interrogatories (or the Court quashing such interrogatories) and (2) the Court's resolution of the Government's July 18 Motion. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/24/2012) (jfe)
July 25, 2012 230 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B Sand from Barry Boss dated 7/23/2012 re: Request that Full Tilt shall have until July 27, 2012, to file a motion to dismiss and the Government shall have until that same date to file a motion to strike the claim of Full Tilt. Unless further amended by the Court, opposition to any motion to dismiss filed by Full Tilt and to any motion to strike the claim of Full Tilt filed by the Government shall be filed by August 17,2012. Replies regarding such motion to dismiss and such motion to strike shall be filed by August 24, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Motions due by 7/27/2012. Responses due by 8/17/2012, Replies due by 8/24/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/25/2012) (cd)
July 23, 2012 229 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on THE POKER PLAYERS ALLIANCE'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICUS CURIAE: Leave to participate as amicus is granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/19/2012) (cd)
July 19, 2012 228 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Jason H. Cowley dated 7/17/2012 re: Upon the request of the Full Tilt Poker entities ("Full Tilt"), the Government respectfully writes to request a brief adjournment of certain upcoming deadlines. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/23/2012., Responses due by 8/13/2012, Replies due by 8/20/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/19/2012) (ama)
July 18, 2012 227 DECLARATION of AUSA Jason H. Cowley in Support re: 225 MOTION to (1) Conduct Expedited Discovery Relating to Fugitive Disentitlement and (2) Stay Consideration of the Pokerstars Claimants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint. MOTION to (1) Conduct Expedited Discovery Relating to Fugitive Disentitlement and (2) Stay Consideration of the Pokerstars Claimants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cowley, Jason)
July 18, 2012 226 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 225 MOTION to (1) Conduct Expedited Discovery Relating to Fugitive Disentitlement and (2) Stay Consideration of the Pokerstars Claimants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint. MOTION to (1) Conduct Expedited Discovery Relating to Fugitive Disentitlement and (2) Stay Consideration of the Pokerstars Claimants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowley, Jason)
July 18, 2012 225 MOTION to (1) Conduct Expedited Discovery Relating to Fugitive Disentitlement and (2) Stay Consideration of the Pokerstars Claimants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 16, 2012 224 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 223 MOTION to Strike Document No. 59 (Claim of Kentucky) and Dismiss Counterclaim.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cowley, Jason)
July 16, 2012 223 MOTION to Strike Document No. 59 (Claim of Kentucky) and Dismiss Counterclaim. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 16, 2012 222 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 7/13/2012 re: Because other claimants, including the Oldford Group Ltd. and other PokerStars-related entities, have asserted an interest in the funds in those accounts, including the Proposed Forfeited Funds, the Government respectfully requests that the Court So Order that the Government maintain the Proposed Forfeited Funds in a seized asset account until such claims are resolved and that no final forfeiture of the Proposed Forfeited Funds can take place until the resolution of such claims. Counsel for the PokerStars-related entities consents to this application. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/16/2012) (lmb)
July 16, 2012 221 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 220 MOTION to Stay In Rem Claims As To Domain Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Order Of Seizure Of Domain Names, # 3 Exhibit Findings Of Fact & Conclusions Of Law, # 4 Exhibit Service Letter to GoDaddy, # 5 Exhibit Service Letter to Network Solutions, # 6 Exhibit Service Letter to Nom-IQ, # 7 Exhibit Service Letter to Register.com, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Filing Registrar Certificate, # 9 Exhibit Opinion & Order, # 10 Exhibit iMEGA I Opinion, # 11 Exhibit iMEGA II Opinion, # 12 Exhibit Order Of Forfeiture Of Domain Defendants)(Lycan, David)
July 16, 2012 220 MOTION to Stay In Rem Claims As To Domain Defendants. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet.(Lycan, David)
July 16, 2012 219 Featured Case ORDER: Upon application of Defendant Raymond Bitar, it is hereby ordered that these proceedings be stayed as to Raymond Bitar until the completion of the criminal proceedings against him in United States v. Bitar, 12 Cr. 529 (BSJ). This Order is without prejudice to the right of the United States to seek the forfeiture of the assets of Full Tilt Poker and its affiliates during the period of the stay. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/16/2012) (lmb)
July 12, 2012 218 AFFIRMATION of Richard Levitt in Support re: 217 FIRST MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings as to Raymond Bitar.. Document filed by Raymond Bitar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Staying Proceedings)(Levitt, Richard)
July 12, 2012 217 FIRST MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings as to Raymond Bitar. Document filed by Raymond Bitar.(Levitt, Richard)
July 12, 2012 216 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 215 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. and Proposed Brief. Document filed by Poker Players Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Dreifach, Kenneth)
July 12, 2012 215 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Poker Players Alliance.(Dreifach, Kenneth)
July 12, 2012 214 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Marc Dreifach on behalf of Poker Players Alliance (Dreifach, Kenneth)
July 12, 2012 213 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 11, 2012 212 CLAIM FOR PERSUANT TO RULE G OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RULES FOR ADMIRALTY AND MARITIME CLAIMS (Amended Verified). Document filed by Raymond Bitar. (Baughman, John)
July 11, 2012 211 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 7/10/2012 re: The Government respectfully writes to request a brief adjournment of certain upcoming deadlines. Specifically, we request the following amendments to the current scheduling deadlines in regard to the Government, Raymond Bitar, the Full Tilt Poker entities ("Full Tilt") and the Commonwealth of Kentucky ("Kentucky"): 1. Bitar, Full Tilt, and Kentucky shall have until July 16, 2012 to file a motion to dismiss and the Government shall have until that same date to file a motion to strike the claims of Bitar, Full Tilt, and Kentucky. 2. Unless further amended by the Court, opposition to any motions to dismiss filed by Bitar, Full Tilt, or Kentucky, and the Government's motion to strike the claims of Bitar, Full Tilt or Kentucky shall be filed by August 6, 2012. 3. Replies regarding such motion to dismiss and any such motions to strike shall be filed by August 13, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/13/2012, Responses due by 8/6/2012, Replies due by 8/13/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/11/2012) (djc)
July 11, 2012 210 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, and Jason H. Cowley, of counsel, and the Claimant, by its counsel, Michael Bachner, Esq., that: The Claimant and Gregory Colton ("Colton"), Managing Director of Claimant, represent that approximately $6,274,751.59 is the total amount of Defendant Funds directly traceable to Claimant's payment processing for Redfall International. Claimant agrees that $6,274,751.59 of the Defendant Property shall be forfeited to the United States ("the Forfeited Funds"), for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, without admitting any liability thereunder. Four Oaks Bank and Trust Co. ("Four Oaks"), upon being provided a copy of this Stipulation and Order shall issue a check for $6,062,116.49 of the Forfeited Funds payable to the United States Marshals Service, Southern District of New York, and send such check to the address herein. 3. The remainder of the Forfeited Funds, $212,635.10 (the "Four Oaks Funds"), shall be released and conveyed to Four Oaks to reimburse Four Oaks for expenses incurred as a result of LST Financial's processing of funds at Four Oaks. The Claimant hereby withdraws its claim and agrees that it shall not file any claim or petition for restoration or remission relative to the Defendant Property, or any action or motion seeking to collaterally attack the seizure, restraint, or forfeiture of the Defendant Property (including the Forfeited Funds). Furthermore, the parties hereby waive all rights to appeal or to otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/11/2012) (djc)
July 10, 2012 209 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from David M. Zornow dated 7/9/2012 re: We write as counsel for PokerStars, Oldford Group Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises Ltd., Pyr Software Ltd., Stelekram Ltd., and Sphene International Ltd. (defined as the "PokerStars Companies") in the above-referenced action to request permission to file under seal an exhibit to the PokerStars Companies' Motion to Dismiss, filed today. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/9/2012) (djc)
July 10, 2012 208 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from David M. Zornow dated 7/9/2012 re: The PokerStars Companies intend to file herewith a motion to dismiss the Verified First Amended Complaint (the "Complaint"), and respectfully request that the Court permit the filing of a memorandum of law of up to 51 pages. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/9/2012) (djc)
July 9, 2012 207 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 206 MOTION to Strike Document No. 77 (Seigal Class Claim).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 206 MOTION to Strike Document No. 77 (Seigal Class Claim). Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 205 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 204 DECLARATION of David M. Zornow in Support re: 201 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim.. Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, PYR Softward Ltd, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5 To be Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit A-6)(Zornow, David)
July 9, 2012 203 MOTION to Strike Document No. 62 (Claim of Cardroom International). Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 202 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 201 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim.. Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, PYR Softward Ltd, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd.. (Zornow, David)
July 9, 2012 201 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim. Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, PYR Softward Ltd, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd.. Responses due by 7/30/2012(Zornow, David)
July 9, 2012 200 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 199 MOTION to Strike Document No. 68 (Claim of Robb Evans).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 199 MOTION to Strike Document No. 68 (Claim of Robb Evans). Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 197 MOTION to Strike Document No. 150 (Claim of Avoine).. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 197 MOTION to Strike Document No. 150 (Claim of Avoine). Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
July 9, 2012 196 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 195 MOTION to Dismiss Verified First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Ferguson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Withers, Julie)
July 9, 2012 195 MOTION to Dismiss Verified First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Ferguson. Responses due by 7/30/2012(Withers, Julie)
July 9, 2012 194 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 193 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Telamonian Ajax Trust. (Souede, Benjamin)
July 9, 2012 193 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Telamonian Ajax Trust. Responses due by 7/30/2012(Souede, Benjamin)
July 9, 2012 192 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 191 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Rafael Furst. (Souede, Benjamin)
July 9, 2012 191 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Rafael Furst. Responses due by 7/30/2012(Souede, Benjamin)
July 9, 2012 190 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 189 MOTION to Dismiss Verified First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Howard Lederer. (Peters, Elliot)
July 9, 2012 189 MOTION to Dismiss Verified First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Howard Lederer. Responses due by 7/30/2012 Return Date set for 8/13/2012 at 11:59 PM.(Peters, Elliot)
July 3, 2012 188 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Civil Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on April 18, 2012 through May 17, 2012. Document filed by United States Of America. (Lockard, Michael)
June 29, 2012 187 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 6/29/2012 re: The Government respectfully writes to request a brief adjournment of certain upcoming deadlines in this action in order to facilitate, and hopefully, to successfully conclude, certain ongoing settlement communications. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2012., Motions due by 7/9/2012., Responses due by 7/30/2012., Replies due by 8/13/2012.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/29/2012) (lmb)
May 24, 2012 186 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 5/8/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 24, 2012 185 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 5/8/2012 before Judge Leonard B. Sand. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 9, 2012 184 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 65 Motion to Strike. For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to strike Webb's claim is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss Webb's counterclaim is also GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/9/2012) (jfe)
May 9, 2012 183 Featured Case CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to dismiss and/or answers from those parties whose time has not expired to file such motions and answers, and motions to strike claims shall be filed by July 2, 2012. Opposition to all motions to dismiss and strike shall be filed by July 23, 2012. Replies shall be filed by August 3, 2012. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than March 5, 2013. All production of documents to be completed by November 5, 2012. Depositions of fact witness to be completed by February 25, 2013. Request to Admit to be served no later than March 4, 2013. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than April 10, 2013. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for March 11, 2013 at 10:00 AM.( Expert Discovery due by 4/10/2013.) Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2012. Motions due by 10/1/2012. Responses due by 7/23/2012 Replies due by 8/3/2012. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/8/2012) (rdz)
May 2, 2012 182 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard and Jason H. Cowley dated 4/30/12 re: Counsel for the Government requests that Webb's claim in this action be dismissed and that the relief he requests in his letter of 4/19/12 be denied. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons expressed above, the relief sought by Claimant Webb in his letter of April 19, 2012 is denied. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/2/2012) (mro)
April 30, 2012 181 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER IN REGARD TO CHAD ELIE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, united States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Chad Elie, by his attorneys, Barry H. Berke, Esq., and Dani R. James, Esq., that:1. Chad Elie hereby withdraws his claim asserting an interest in the Claimed Property. Upon the Court's endorsement of this Stipulation and Order, said claim is hereby deemed dismissed with prejudice, without costs and/or attorney's fees to either party. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/30/2012) (djc)
April 4, 2012 180 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, and Jason H. Cowley dated 4/4/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiff requests that the Initial Pre-Trial Conference be adjourned until either May 7 or May 8, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to May 8, 2012 at 4:30 PM in Court Room 15A. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 5/8/2012 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/4/2012) (ft)
March 29, 2012 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Inbal Paz on behalf of Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Poker, Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua, Ultimate BET (Paz, Inbal)
March 29, 2012 178 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerry D. Bernstein on behalf of Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Poker, Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua, Ultimate BET (Bernstein, Jerry)
March 29, 2012 177 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua for Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Poker, Absolute Poker, Ultimate BET. Document filed by Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Poker, Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua, Ultimate BET.(Bernstein, Jerry)
March 27, 2012 176 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Christopher Ferguson's time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint until 5/14/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/27/2012) (ab)
March 20, 2012 175 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Rafael Furst, by his attorney, David Angeli, Esq. of the Angeli Law Group, that: (1.)Rafael Furst shall have until May 14, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended complaint. (2.)The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals.SO ORDERED.Rafael Furst answer due 5/14/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ama)
March 20, 2012 174 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Absolute Poker, by their attorney, Jerry D. Bernstein, Esq. and Marc Rothenberg, Esq. of Blank Rome, LLP,that: (1.) Absolute Poker shall have until May 14, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (2.) This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. SO ORDERED.Absolute Poker answer due 5/14/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ama)
March 20, 2012 173 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Howard Lederer, by his attorney, Elliot Remsen Peters, Esq. of Keker & Van Nest, LLP, that: (1.) Howard Lederer shall have until May 14, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (2.) The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which willbe deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. SO ORDERED.Howard Lederer answer due 5/14/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ama)
March 20, 2012 172 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Raymond Bitar shall have until 5/14/2012 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ab)
March 20, 2012 171 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Pokerstars shall have until 5/14/2012 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ab)
March 20, 2012 170 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Chad Elie shall have until 5/14/2012 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ab)
March 20, 2012 169 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt Poker shall have until 5/14/2012 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/20/2012) (ab)
March 9, 2012 168 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA.(Rodes, Leonard)
February 16, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 166 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 02/06/2012, Receipt Number 1028801. (jd)
February 15, 2012 167 Featured Case ORDER: granting 166 Motion for David H. Angeli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/15/2012) (jfe)
February 14, 2012 166 MOTION for David H. Angeli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Rafael Furst.(sjo)
February 8, 2012 165 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Absolute Poker, by their attorney, Jerry D. Bernstein, Esq. and Marc Rothenberg, Esq. of Blank Rome, LLP, that: 1. Absolute Poker shall have until March 19, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. 2. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. 3. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. Absolute Poker answer due 3/19/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/8/2012) (lmb)
February 8, 2012 164 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Full Tilt, by their attorney, Barry Boss, Esq., of Cozen O'Connor, that: 1. Full Tilt shall have until March 19, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. 2. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. 3. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. Full Tilt Poker Ltd. answer due 3/19/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/8/2012) (lmb)
February 8, 2012 163 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and the PokerStars Companies, by their attorney, David M. Zornow, Esq., of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, that: 1. The PokerStars Companies shall have until March 19, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. 2. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. 3. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. Pokerstars answer due 3/19/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/8/2012) (lmb)
January 30, 2012 162 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Avoine, by its attorney, Leonard A. Rodes, Esq. of Trachtenberg Rodes & Friedberg LLP, that: 1.Avoine shall have until March 9, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. 2. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an Original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA answer due 3/9/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/30/2012) (lmb)
January 24, 2012 161 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Howard Lederer, by his attorney, Elliot Remsen Peters, Esq. of Keker & Van Nest, LLP, that: Howard Lederer shall have until March 19, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint.Howard Lederer answer due 3/19/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/24/2012) (djc)
January 23, 2012 160 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Christopher Ferguson shall have until March 19, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Christopher Ferguson answer due 3/19/2012). (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/23/2012) (djc)
January 23, 2012 159 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Rafael Furst shall have Until March 19, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Rafael Furst answer due 3/19/2012). (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/23/2012) (djc)
January 23, 2012 158 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Chad Elie, by his attorneys, Barry H. Berke, Esq., and Dani R. James, Esq., that: 1. Chad Elie shall have until March 19, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Chad Elie answer due 3/19/2012). (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/23/2012) (djc)
January 23, 2012 157 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Raymond Bitar shall have until March 19, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Raymond Bitar answer due 3/19/2012). (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/23/2012) (djc)
January 10, 2012 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry H. Berke, Dani R. James and Jade A. Burns on behalf of Chad Elie (James, Dani) Modified on 1/10/2012 (djc).
January 10, 2012 155 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP hereby is substituted in place of the law firm William Cowden LLC as counsel of record for claimant Chad Elie in the above-captioned action. A supporting declaration is attached hereto pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that all pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in this matter should be served upon the following incoming counsel: Barry H. Berke, (bberke@kramerlevin.com) Dani R. James (djames@kramerlevin.com) Jade A. Burns (jbums@kramerlevin.com) KRAMER LEVIN NAFTALIS & FRANKEL LLP, 1177 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10036 Tel.: (212) 715-9100 Fax: (212) 715-8000 (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/9/2012) (djc)
January 10, 2012 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jade Anne Burns on behalf of Chad Elie (Burns, Jade)
January 10, 2012 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry H Berke on behalf of Chad Elie (Berke, Barry)
January 9, 2012 152 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that the law firm of Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP hereby is substituted in place of the law firm William Cowden LLC as counsel of record for claimant Chad Elie in the above-captioned action. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/9/2012) (ja)
January 6, 2012 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leonard Anthony Rodes on behalf of Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA (Rodes, Leonard)
January 5, 2012 150 CLAIM. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. (Rodes, Leonard)
January 5, 2012 149 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Madeira Fjord for Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA. Document filed by Avoine-Servico de Consultadoria e Marketing LDA.(Rodes, Leonard)
December 30, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Oldford Group LTD answer due 2/6/2012; Oldford Group Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; PYR Softward Ltd answer due 2/6/2012; PYR Software Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Pokerstars answer due 2/6/2012; Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD. answer due 2/6/2012; Sphene International Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012. (jfe)
December 30, 2011 148 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that: The PokerStars Companies shall have until February 6, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/28/2011) (jfe)
December 27, 2011 147 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Chad Elie shall have until 1/23/2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/26/2011) (ft)
December 27, 2011 146 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt shall have until 2/6/2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Filco Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Full Tilt Poker answer due 2/6/2012; Full Tilt Poker Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Kolyma Corporation A.V.V. answer due 2/6/2012; Mail Media Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Pocket Kings Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Ranston Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Tiltware LLC answer due 2/6/2012; Vantage Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/26/2011) (ft)
December 27, 2011 145 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Absolute Poker shall have until 2/6/2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Absolute Entertainment, S.A. answer due 2/6/2012; Absolute Poker answer due 2/6/2012; Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua answer due 2/6/2012; Blue Water Services Ltd answer due 2/6/2012; Fiducia Exchange Ltd answer due 2/6/2012; SGS Systems Inc answer due 2/6/2012; Trust Services Ltd. answer due 2/6/2012; Ultimate BET answer due 2/6/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/26/2011) (ft)
December 20, 2011 144 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Howard Lederer, by his attorney, Elliot Remsen Peters, Esq. of Keker & Van Nest, LLP, that: Howard Lederer shall have until January 23, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Howard Lederer answer due 1/23/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/20/2011) (mro)
December 20, 2011 143 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Rafael Furst, by his attorney, Benjamin N. Souede, Esq. of Angeli Law Group LLC, that: Rafael Furst shall have until January 23, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Rafael Furst answer due 1/23/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/20/2011) (mro)
December 20, 2011 142 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant united States Attorney, of counsel, and Raymond Bitar, by his attorney, Richard Ware Levitt, Esq. of Levitt & Kaizer, that: Raymond Bitar shall have until January 23, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Raymond Bitar answer due 1/23/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/20/2011) (mro) Modified on 12/20/2011 (mro).
December 20, 2011 141 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant united States Attorney, of counsel, and Christopher Ferguson, by his attorney Jonathan Harris of Harris, Cutler & Houghteling LLP that: Christopher Ferguson shall have until January 23, 2012, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Christopher Ferguson answer due 1/23/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/20/2011) (mro) Modified on 12/20/2011 (mro).
December 13, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 128 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 129 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $400.00, paid on 11/22/2011, Receipt Number 1022513,1022517. (jd)
December 12, 2011 140 Featured Case ORDER: granting 128 Motion for Eric MacMichael to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/12/2011) (pl)
December 5, 2011 139 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Motion for Cody Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/5/2011) (lmb)
December 5, 2011 138 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Chad Elie, by his attorney, William R. Cowden, Esq., that: Chad Elie shall have until December 19, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Chad Elie answer due 12/19/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/5/2011) (lmb)
November 30, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Absolute Entertainment, S.A. answer due 1/2/2012; Absolute Poker answer due 1/2/2012; Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua answer due 1/2/2012; Blue Water Services Ltd answer due 1/2/2012; Fiducia Exchange Ltd answer due 1/2/2012; SGS Systems Inc answer due 1/2/2012; Trust Services Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Ultimate BET answer due 1/2/2012. (ft)
November 30, 2011 137 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt shall have until 1/2/2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. Filco Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Full Tilt Poker answer due 1/2/2012; Full Tilt Poker Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Kolyma Corporation A.V.V. answer due 1/2/2012; Mail Media Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Pocket Kings Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Ranston Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Tiltware LLC answer due 1/2/2012; Vantage Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/30/2011) (ft)
November 30, 2011 136 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Claimant agrees that the Defendant Property of $8,018.04 shall be forfeited to the United States, for disposition according to law, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981, without admitting any liability thereunder. The Claimant hereby withdraws its claim and agrees that it shall not file any claim or petition for restoration or remission relative to the Defendant Property, or any action or motion seeking to collaterally attack the seizure, restraint, or forfeiture of the Defendant Property. Furthermore, the parties hereby waive all rights to appeal or to otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order of Settlement. This Stipulation and Order of Settlement shall in no way be deemed an admission of culpability, liability, or guilt on behalf of the Claimant, or of the plaintiff United States or any of their respective agents, officers or employees, past and present. Further, this Stipulation and Order of Settlement shall in no way constitute any reflection upon the merits of the claims and defenses asserted respectively by the United States and the Claimant. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/30/2011) (ft)
November 30, 2011 135 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The PokerStars Companies shall have until 1/2/2012 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. Oldford Group LTD answer due 1/2/2012; PYR Softward Ltd answer due 1/2/2012; Pokerstars answer due 1/2/2012; Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD. answer due 1/2/2012; Sphene International Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Stelekram Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/30/2011) (ft)
November 30, 2011 134 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Absolute Poker shall have until 1/2/2012, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. Absolute Entertainment, S.A. answer due 1/2/2012; Absolute Poker answer due 1/2/2012; Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua answer due 1/2/2012; Blue Water Services Ltd answer due 1/2/2012; Fiducia Exchange Ltd answer due 1/2/2012; SGS Systems Inc answer due 1/2/2012; Trust Services Ltd. answer due 1/2/2012; Ultimate BET answer due 1/2/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/30/2011) (ft)
November 30, 2011 133 RESPONSE re: 53 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Ultra Safe Pay, LLC. (Michaels, Adam)
November 30, 2011 132 RESPONSE re: 53 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by MAS, Inc.. (Michaels, Adam)
November 30, 2011 131 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Ultra Safe Pay, LLC.(Michaels, Adam)
November 30, 2011 130 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by MAS, Inc..(Michaels, Adam)
November 29, 2011 127 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Verified Answer served on Steven J. McCool and Ian J. Imrich on 11/28/2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Graham, Christopher)
November 28, 2011 126 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Verified Claim of Christopher Ferguson Pursuant to Rule G(5)(a) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty and Maritime Claims. Document filed by Christopher Ferguson. (Harris, Jonathan)
November 28, 2011 125 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Robb Evans.(Graham, Christopher)
November 28, 2011 124 CLAIM FOR ADMIRALTY. Document filed by Howard Lederer. (Peters, Elliot)
November 28, 2011 123 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Telamonian Ajax Trust. (Souede, Benjamin)
November 28, 2011 122 CLAIM FOR FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Rafael Furst. (Souede, Benjamin)
November 23, 2011 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Nessim Souede on behalf of Telamonian Ajax Trust (Souede, Benjamin)
November 23, 2011 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Nessim Souede on behalf of Rafael Furst (Souede, Benjamin)
November 23, 2011 119 CONSENT MOTION for Steven J. McCool to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Chad Elie.(Cowden, William)
November 23, 2011 118 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Raymond Bitar shall have until 12/19/2011, to file an answer to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/23/2011) (cd)
November 22, 2011 129 MOTION for Cody Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Howard Lederer.(bwa)
November 22, 2011 128 MOTION for Eric MacMichael to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Howard Lederer.(bwa)
November 22, 2011 117 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Civil Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on May 16, 2011 through June 14, 2011. Document filed by United States Of America. (Lockard, Michael)
November 21, 2011 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elliot Remsen Peters on behalf of Howard Lederer (Peters, Elliot)
November 16, 2011 115 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 65 MOTION to Strike Document No. 37 (Claim) and Dismiss Counter Claim.. Document filed by Adam Webb. (Kessler, Steven)
November 15, 2011 114 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Rakestraw Cowden on behalf of Chad Elie. New Address: William Cowden LLC, 2002 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 100, Washington, DC 20036, 202.642.0209. (Cowden, William)
November 14, 2011 113 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Pocket Kings Ltd.. (Boss, Lenard)
November 14, 2011 112 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Tiltware LLC. (Boss, Lenard)
November 14, 2011 111 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Vantage Ltd.. (Boss, Lenard)
November 14, 2011 110 CLAIM FOR CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Filco Ltd.. (Boss, Lenard)
November 14, 2011 109 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tiltware LLC for Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Vantage Ltd.; Corporate Parent Filco Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent Regent Nominees Limited for Filco Ltd.. Document filed by Filco Ltd., Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Pocket Kings Ltd., Tiltware LLC, Vantage Ltd..(Boss, Lenard)
November 14, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER: Upon the motion of Jonathan Harris, counsel for Defendant and Claimant Christopher Ferguson, and his declaration in support IT IS HEREBY ORDERED thatIan J. Imrich is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mr. Ferguson in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District ofNew York. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/7/2011) (rdz)
November 14, 2011 107 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dylan C. Braverman on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet. New Address: Bower Monte & Greene, P.C., 261 Madison Avenue, 12th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10016, 212-599-0900. (Braverman, Dylan)
November 11, 2011 106 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rafael Furst waiver sent on 10/18/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
November 11, 2011 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Raymond Bitar waiver sent on 10/18/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
November 11, 2011 104 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Christopher Ferguson waiver sent on 10/18/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
November 11, 2011 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Howard Lederer waiver sent on 10/18/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
November 10, 2011 102 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint,,,,,., COUNTERCLAIM against United States Of America. Document filed by Steve Segal.(Burt, Thomas)
November 7, 2011 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 100 Motion for Ian J. Imrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that Ian J. Imrich is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Mr. Ferguson. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/7/2011) (mro)
November 4, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 100 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 11/01/2011, Receipt Number 1020714. (jd)
November 4, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 10/31/2011, Receipt Number 1020532. (jd)
November 2, 2011 99 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 11/1/2011 re: counsel for The Government writes to respectfully request an enlargement of the page limit for its reply memorandum of law in further support of its motion to strike the claim and counterclaim of Adam Webb, an online poker player, The 17-page reply brief, filed yesterday, addresses arguments and issues raised in Webb's opposition that were not included in Webb's claim, and accordingly, the Government seeks a modest enlargement of 7 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/2/2011) (pl)
November 1, 2011 100 MOTION for Ian J. Imrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Christopher Ferguson.(bwa) (pgu).
November 1, 2011 98 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Absolute Poker answer to the Amended Complaint due 11/30/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 97 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt shall have until 11/14/2011, to file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims. Full Tilt answer to Amended Complaint due 11/30/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 96 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Autoscribe Corporation answer to complaint due 11/30/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 95 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: MAS, Inc. answer to the Amended Complaint due 11/30/2011; Ultra Safe Pay, LLC answer to the Amended Complaint due 11/30/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 94 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, Chad Elie answer to complaint due 11/30/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 93 MEMO ENDORSED granting 83 Motion for Anand S Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Oldford Group Ltd, Rational Entertainment Enterprises Ltd, Pyr Software Ltd, Stelekram Ltd, and Sphene Internation Ltd. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/1/2011) (cd)
November 1, 2011 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Steve Spiegel on behalf of Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd., Pokerstars, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd. (Spiegel, Lawrence)
October 31, 2011 91 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 65 MOTION to Strike Document No. 37 (Claim) and Dismiss Counter Claim.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
October 31, 2011 90 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd.. (Zornow, David)
October 31, 2011 89 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY PURSUANT TO RULE G(5). Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd.. (Zornow, David)
October 31, 2011 88 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd..(Zornow, David)
October 31, 2011 87 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Oldford Group Ltd. for Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Rational Entertainment Enterprises Ltd., Sphene International Ltd., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd., Stelekram Ltd.. Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd..(Zornow, David)
October 31, 2011 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Zornow on behalf of Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd., Pokerstars, Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd. (Zornow, David)
October 31, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Oldford Group LTD answer due 11/30/2011; Oldford Group Ltd. answer due 11/30/2011; PYR Softward Ltd answer due 11/30/2011; PYR Software Ltd. answer due 11/30/2011; Pokerstars answer due 11/30/2011; Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD. answer due 11/30/2011; Sphene International Ltd. answer due 11/30/2011; Stelekram Ltd. answer due 11/30/2011. (djc)
October 31, 2011 85 CLAIM FOR Property/Admiralty Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 983(a)(4) and Rule G(5)(a) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. Document filed by Blanca Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bernstein, Jerry)
October 31, 2011 84 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Jason H. Cowley, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and the PokerStars Companies, by their atorney, David M. Zornow, Esq., of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, that: 1. The PokerStars Companies shall have until November 30, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. 2. This Order is without prejudice to any rights, remedies, claims, or defenses of any of the parties hereto. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/31/2011) (djc)
October 31, 2011 83 MOTION for Anand S. Raman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd..(wb) (pgu).
October 31, 2011 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Vianne Withers on behalf of Christopher Ferguson (Withers, Julie)
October 27, 2011 81 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Michael D. Lockard, Assistant United States Attorney, of counsel, and Robb Evans, by his attorney, Gary Owen Caris, Esq. of McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, that: 1. Robb Evans shall have until November 28, 2011, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/26/2011) (rjm)
October 24, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply Brief due by 10/31/2011. (rdz)
October 24, 2011 80 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Sharon Cohen Levin dated 10/21/2011 re: The Government respectfully writes to request a brief extension of the current deadline of October 24, 2011 for the Government's reply brief in relation to its motion to strike the claim and dismiss the counter claim of Adam Webb. The Government requests that it be permitted to tile its reply brief no later October 31, 2011. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11-2564) (rdz)
October 21, 2011 79 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC.(Hantman, Robert)
October 21, 2011 78 ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against United States Of America. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet.(Lycan, David)
October 19, 2011 77 CLAIM FOR ADMIRALTY OR MARITIME AND ASSET FORFEITURE ACTIONS. Document filed by Steve Segal. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Burt, Thomas)
October 19, 2011 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas H. Burt on behalf of Steve Segal (Burt, Thomas)
October 17, 2011 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 65 MOTION to Strike Document No. 37 (Claim) and Dismiss Counter Claim. by Claimant Adam Webb. Document filed by Adam Webb. (Kessler, Steven)
October 13, 2011 74 MEMO ENDORSED granting 72 Motion for Leslie Anne Hawes to Appear Pro Hac Vice for claimant, Robb Evans. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/13/2011) (cd)
October 13, 2011 73 MEMO ENDORSED granting 71 Motion for Gary Owen Caris to Appear Pro Hac Vice for claimant, Robb Evans. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/13/2011) (cd) (Main Document 73 replaced on 10/13/2011) (cd).
October 12, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $400.00, paid on 10/11/2011, Receipt Number 1018651,1018652. (jd)
October 11, 2011 72 MOTION for Lesley Anne Hawes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robb Evans.(pgu)
October 11, 2011 71 MOTION for Gary Owen Caris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Robb Evans.(pgu)
October 6, 2011 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Colinet on behalf of Christopher Ferguson (Colinet, Paul)
October 6, 2011 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Andrew Harris on behalf of Christopher Ferguson (Harris, Jonathan)
October 5, 2011 68 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Robb Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kaufman, Alan)
October 4, 2011 67 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: that Chad Elie shall have until 10/31/2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/3/2011) (cd)
October 3, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Chad Elie answer due 10/31/2011. (cd)
October 3, 2011 66 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 65 MOTION to Strike Document No. 37 (Claim) and Dismiss Counter Claim.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
October 3, 2011 65 MOTION to Strike Document No. 37 (Claim) and Dismiss Counter Claim. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
October 3, 2011 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt shall have until October 31, 2011, to(a) file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property and (b) answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/3/2011) (rdz)
October 3, 2011 63 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: MAS, Inc. and Ultra Safe pay, LLC each shall have until October 31, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/3/2011) (rdz)
September 30, 2011 62 CLAIM FOR ADMIRALTY, PROPERTY. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC. (Hantman, Robert)
September 30, 2011 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cardroom International, LLC.(Hantman, Robert)
September 30, 2011 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J Hantman on behalf of Cardroom International, LLC (Hantman, Robert)
September 30, 2011 59 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Second Amended In Rem Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Kentucky Seizure Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Kentucky Findings Of Fact & Conclusions Of Law)(Lycan, David)
September 29, 2011 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ae)
September 29, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Jason Harris Cowley for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 53 Amended Complaint,,,, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mro)
September 29, 2011 58 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Absolute Poker shall have until October 31, 2011, to (a) file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property, and (b) answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Absolute Entertainment, S.A. answer due 10/31/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/29/2011) (cd)
September 29, 2011 57 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The PokerStars Companies shall have until October 31, 2011, to (a) file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property and (b) answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Oldford Group LTD answer due 10/31/2011; PYR Softward Ltd answer due 10/31/2011; Pokerstars answer due 10/31/2011; Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD. answer due 10/31/2011; Sphene International Ltd. answer due 10/31/2011; Stelekram Ltd. answer due 10/31/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/29/2011) (cd)
September 29, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Full Tilt Poker answer to the Amended Complaint due 10/31/2011. (cd)
September 28, 2011 55 CLAIM FOR Pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty and Maritime Claims. Document filed by Raymond Bitar. (Levitt, Richard)
September 28, 2011 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Ware Levitt on behalf of Raymond Bitar (Levitt, Richard)
September 21, 2011 53 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 8 Complaint, against Absolute Entertainment, S.A., Absolute Poker, Absolutepoker.com, All Right, Title And Interest In The Assests Of Pokerstars, All Right, Title, And Interest In The Properties Listed In Schedule B, Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua, Blue Water Services Ltd, Fiducia Exchange Ltd, Filco Ltd., Full Tilt Poker, Full Tilt Poker Ltd., Fulltiltpoker.com, Including But Not Limited To The Properties Listed In Schedule A, Such As But Not Limited To The Domain Names Pokerstars, Com, Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Mail Media Ltd., Oldford Group LTD, Oldford Group Ltd., PYR Softward Ltd, PYR Software Ltd., Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Pocket Kings Ltd., Pokerstars, Ranston Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD., SGS Systems Inc, Sphene International Ltd., Stelekram Ltd., Tiltware LLC, Trust Services Ltd, Trust Services Ltd., UB.com, Ultimate BET, Utimate BET, Vantage Ltd., Raymond Bitar, Howard Lederer, Christopher Ferguson, Rafael Furst, Consulting Ltd., Filco Ltd., Ultimatebet.com, All Right, Title, and Interest in the Properties Listed in Schedule C.Document filed by United States Of America. Related document: 8 Complaint, filed by United States Of America.(mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2011: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 EX. D, # 5 EX.E, # 6 EX.F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J) (ama).
September 20, 2011 52 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued against All funds and other property on deposit in the listed accounts of this warrant on 9/20/2011. (Signed by Judge Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/19/2011) (jar)
September 20, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER: granting 48 Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED that the United States of America is granted leave to file an amended complaint in the form submitted in connection with the application for leave to amend. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/19/2011) (jfe) (Main Document 51 replaced on 9/20/2011) (jfe).
September 20, 2011 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
September 20, 2011 49 DECLARATION of Michael D. Lockard in Support re: 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit A (Part 9), # 10 Exhibit A (Part 10), # 11 Exhibit A (Part 11), # 12 Exhibit B)(Cowley, Jason)
September 20, 2011 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cowley, Jason)
September 6, 2011 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: that Autoscribe Corporation shall have until September 30, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/6/2011) (ft)
September 2, 2011 46 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: PokerStars and any of its subsidiaries, affiliates, anyone acting on behalf of PokerStars, all persons or entities acting in concert or participation with any of the above, and all persons and entities having actual knowledge of this Order, shall not directly or indirectly, transfer, sell, assign, pledge, hypothecate, encumber, dissipate, distribute, or move $5.5 million in the Account. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/1/2011) (jar)
August 24, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 08/12/2011, Receipt Number 1013993. (jd)
August 18, 2011 45 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary of Justice & Public Safety Cabinet shall have until September 30, 2011 to (a) file pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Marine Claims for any or all of the Subject Property and (b) answer or otherwise assert any rights it may be entitled to assert herein. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/18/2011) (rdz)
August 12, 2011 44 NOTICE of Waiver of Service for PokerStars Companies. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 The PokerStars Companies Waiver of Service, # 2 Pyr Software Ltd. Waiver of Service)(Lockard, Michael)
August 12, 2011 43 NOTICE of Waiver of Service for Full Tilt Companies. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Full Tilt Companies Waiver of Service)(Lockard, Michael)
August 12, 2011 42 NOTICE of Waiver of Service for Absolute Poker Companies. Document filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 The Absolute Poker Companies Waiver of Service)(Lockard, Michael)
August 4, 2011 41 ANSWER to 8 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against United States Of America. Document filed by Adam Webb.(Kessler, Steven)
July 26, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for D. Eric Lycan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/26/2011) (ja)
July 22, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/18/2011, Receipt Number 11846. (jd)
July 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/11/2011, Receipt Number 11230. (jd)
July 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/29/2011, Receipt Number 10383. (jd)
July 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 06/29/2011, Receipt Number 10299. (jd)
July 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Chad Elie answer due 9/30/2011. (jfe)
July 18, 2011 38 MOTION for D. Eric Lycan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet.(pgu)
July 15, 2011 37 CLAIM FOR Claim in Forfeiture Proceeding Pursuant to Admiralty and Maritime Rules. Document filed by Adam Webb. (Kessler, Steven)
July 15, 2011 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Leigh Kessler on behalf of Adam Webb (Kessler, Steven)
July 15, 2011 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dylan C. Braverman on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky, ex. rel. J. Michael Brown, Secretary, Justice and Public Safety Cabinet (Braverman, Dylan)
July 14, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 32 Motion for L. Barrett Boss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiltware LLC, Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Pocket Kings Ltd., Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Filco Ltd., Vantage, Ltd., Ranston Ltd., and Mail Media Ltd., (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/14/11) (djc)
July 13, 2011 39 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, Chad Elie shall have until September 30, 2011, to file an answer to the Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/13/2011) (jfe)
July 13, 2011 33 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that MAS, Inc. and Ultra Safe Pay, LLC each shall have until September 30, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/13/2011) (jfe)
July 11, 2011 32 MOTION for L. Barrett Boss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Filco Ltd., Kolyma Corporation A.V.V., Mail Media Ltd., Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd., Pocket Kings Ltd., Ranston Ltd., Tiltware LLC, Vantage Ltd.(pgu)
July 11, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 24 Motion for William R. Cowden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/11/11) (js)
July 11, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 23 Motion for Steven J. McCool to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: without objection. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/11/11) (js)
July 11, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER for admission pro hac vice: granting 25 Motion for Jeremy D. Frey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/11/2011) (js)
June 30, 2011 28 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: On or about April 14, 2011, a verified complaint, 11 Civ. 2564 (LBS) (the "Complaint") was filed under seal in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York seeking the forfeiture of certain properties (the "Subject Property") pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 1955 (d), 981 (a) (1) (A), and 981 (a) (1) (C), and seeking civil money laundering penalties pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 1956 against, inter alia, PokerStars, Oldford Group Ltd., Rational Entertainment Enterprises Ltd., Pyr Software Ltd., Stelekram Ltd., and International Ltd. (the "PokerStars Companies"); on or about May 27, 2011, the United States provided notice of the filing of the Complaint to the PokerStars Companies by and through their counsel, David M. Zornow, Esq. of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP; WHEREAS, the PokerStars Companies have requested additional time to file claims for the Subject Party; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by.... 1. The PokerStars Companies and any of their subsidiaries, affiliates, and/or shareholders shall have until September 30, 2011, to file any claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/30/2011) (ja)
June 29, 2011 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Absolute Poker shall have until September 30, 2011, to (a) file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property, and (b) answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and Summons. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/29/2011) (jpo)
June 29, 2011 26 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Full Tilt shall have until September 30, 2011, to (a) file claims pursuant to Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims for any or all of the Subject Property and (b) answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and Summons. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/29/2011) (jpo)
June 29, 2011 25 MOTION for Jeremy D. Frey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by MAS, Inc., Ultra Safe Pay, LLC.(pgu)
June 29, 2011 24 MOTION for William R. Cowden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chad Elie.(pgu)
June 29, 2011 23 MOTION for Steven J. McCool to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chad Elie.(pgu)
June 28, 2011 22 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elizabeth Nicole Warin on behalf of Tiltware LLC. New Address: Cozen O'Connor, 45 Broadway, 16th floor, New York, New York, United States of America 10006, (212) 883-4969. (Warin, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2011 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Nicole Warin on behalf of Tiltware LLC (Warin, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2011 20 CLAIM. Document filed by Ultra Safe Pay, LLC. (Michaels, Adam)
June 21, 2011 19 CLAIM. Document filed by MAS, Inc.. (Michaels, Adam)
June 21, 2011 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ultra Safe Pay, LLC.(Michaels, Adam)
June 21, 2011 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MAS, Inc..(Michaels, Adam)
June 21, 2011 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Benjamin Michaels on behalf of MAS, Inc., Ultra Safe Pay, LLC (Michaels, Adam)
June 16, 2011 15 CLAIM FOR SEIZED PROPERTY. Document filed by LST Financial, Inc.. (Bachner, Michael)
June 16, 2011 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Fred Bachner on behalf of LST Financial, Inc. (Bachner, Michael)
June 15, 2011 13 NOTICE of Verified Claim to Defendants in Rem. Document filed by Chad Elie. (Cornacchia, Michael)
May 11, 2011 10 NOTICE of Agreement Between the United States Attorney's Office and AbsolutePoker/Ultimate Bet Regarding AbsolutePoker/Ultimate Bet's Return of Funds to U.S. Players. Document filed by United States Of America. (Cowley, Jason)
May 11, 2011 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Harris Cowley on behalf of United States Of America (Cowley, Jason)
April 20, 2011 12 NOTICE OF AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND POKERSTARS REGARDING USE OF DOMAIN NAME POKERSTARS.COM. Document filed by United States Of America. (Document originally filed under seal in envelope #3 on 4/20/11) (djc) Modified on 5/11/2011 (djc). (ae).
April 20, 2011 11 NOTICE OF AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE UNITED STA6TES ATTORNEY'S NOFFICE AND VANTAGE LIMITED d/b/a FULL TILE POKER REGARDING USE OF DOMAIN NAME FULLTILTPOKER.COM.(Document originally filed under seal in envelope #3 on 4/20/11) (djc) (ae).
April 20, 2011 8 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 350.00.)Document filed by United States Of America. (orig. document filed under seal in envelope #2). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement complaint (part 2), # 2 Exhibit Exh. A, # 3 Exhibit Exh. B, # 4 Exhibit Exh. C, # 5 Exhibit Exh.D, # 6 Exhibit Exh. E, # 7 Exhibit Exh. F, # 8 Exhibit Exh. G, # 9 Exhibit Exh. H, # 10 Exhibit Exh. I.)(pl) Modified on 5/10/2011 (pl).
April 20, 2011 7 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jason H. Cowley dated 4/15/11 re: counsel for plaintiff respectfully requests permission to disclose and make public the Sealed Material immediately following the execution of one or more arrest warrants in the Scheinberg matter without further order from the Court. As soon as practicable thereafter, the Government will present this letter, if endorsed by the Court, to the appropriate Court personnel so that the Sealed Materials maintained in official Court files can be unsealed. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/15/11). (orig. document filed under seal in envelope #2). (pl) Modified on 5/10/2011 (pl).
April 20, 2011 6 DECLARATION of Jason Cowley in support re: Gov't Application to permit the complaint in this action to be filed under seal. (orig. document filed under seal in envelope #2). (pl)
April 20, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER, that the Verified Complaint shall be filed under seal. The names of the parties shall also remain under seal until further order of the Court. (orig. document filed under seal in envelope #2). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/14/11) (pl)
April 20, 2011 4 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Michael D. Lockard dated 04/15/2011 re: As soon as practicable thereafter, the Government will present this letter, if endorsed by the Court, to the appropriate Court personnel so that the Sealed Materials maintained in official Court files can be unsealed. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 04/15/2011) (mps)
April 20, 2011 3 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 15, 2011 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
April 14, 2011 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (nm)
April 14, 2011 1 Featured Case ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 04/14/2011) (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Unites States v. Pokerstars, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYR Softward Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stelekram Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sphene International Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiltware LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolyma Corporation A.V.V.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocket Kings Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocket Kings Consulting Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filco Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranston Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Media Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Tilt Poker Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGS Systems Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust Services Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pokerstars
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Tilt Poker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Poker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate BET
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldford Group LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rational Entertainment Enterprises LTD.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprises LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Water Services Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Entertainment, S.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiducia Exchange Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Games, Inc. of Antigua
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Jason Harris Cowley
Represented By: Michael Dennis Lockard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]