Pagan et al v. Westchester County et al

Plaintiff: Wilson Pagan, Steven Lewis, Yusuf Dixon, Michael Stevens, Quiane Williams, Santiago Gomez, Guario Vargas, Gerald Charles, Christopher Glivens, William P. Jenkins, Pedro Llerandez, Adem Arici, Jerome Barnett, Joseph Dushock and Armando Sanchez
Defendant: Westchester County, Aramark Commissary and Food Services, Donna Blackmon, Liasion Robinson, D. DiMarco, Louhran, Liaison Robinson and Louhran (Aramark)
Case Number: 1:2012cv07669
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT & RECOMMENDATION: for 130 Report and Recommendation. For the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the Report in full. The claims raised by plaintiffs Dixon, Lewis, Stevens, and Vargas are dismissed without prejudice. The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Netburn for further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/1/2014) (djc)
January 26, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: 151 MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE filed by Armando Sanchez. On December 18, 2014, pro se plaintiff Armando Sanchez filed a motion, requesting permission to rebut the February 3, 2014 Report and Recommendation ("Report& quot;), Dkt. 90 , of the Honorable Sarah Netburn. Dkt. 151. Sanchez claims, inter alia, that he never received copy of the Report, and thus was denied the opportunity to rebut. Id. at 3. Sanchez requests that the Court (1) recall the March 12, 2014 Opinion and Order ("Opinion") it issued, Dkt. 96, which adopted the Report, and (2) grant Sanchez a 45-day extension to file a response to the Report. Because the Opinion, while dismissing claims of some other plaintiffs, largely left Sanchez's undisturbed, the Court denies Sanchez's request as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/26/2015) (ajs)
January 26, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: 149 MOTION for Reconsideration. filed by Jerome Barnett. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants Barnett's Rule 60 motion for reconsideration. The Court directs Barnett to amend the SAC, so as to add his factu al claims, and to file the amended complaint by Friday, February 27, 2015. Discovery in this case is ongoing. On April 10, 2014, Judge Netburn directed the Clerk of Court to attempt to locate pro bono counsel for certain plaintiffs for the limited pu rpose of conducting certain document discovery and depositions, Dkt. 109 , and such counsel was appointed, Dkt. 117 , 118 , 119 . Counsel for plaintiffs is directed to contact Barnett, and file a letter by February 3, 2015, informing the Court if Barnett seeks to be represented by such counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 149. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/26/2015) (ajs)
March 12, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 90 Report and Recommendations, 65 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Kevin Cherveko, Westchester County, 61 Motion to Dismiss filed by Aramark Correctional Services LLC, Donna Blackmon, Joseph Loughran. Fo r the foregoing reasons, the Court adopts the Report in full. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. 61 and Dkt. 65. The case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Netburn for further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/12/2014) (cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagan et al v. Westchester County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yusuf Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guario Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Glivens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Llerandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adem Arici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dushock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Commissary and Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liasion Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louhran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louhran (Aramark)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]