Carter v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al

Defendant: Denise Ryan and Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Carter
 
Case Number: 1:2013fp00275
Filed: June 24, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 11 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 6 Report and Recommendation, recommending that the retaliation claim against Ryan and all of the claims against the HCDC Medical Department be dismissed from this action. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
June 26, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Jerome J. Carter, initial fee of $-0-. Given the plaintiffs current balance there shall be no initial filing fee assessed. In addition, monthly payments of 20 % of each preceding months income credited to the plaintiffs account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 8/26/2013(jeb)
October 15, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerks Office to forward Service documents to US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carter v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]